Anderson v. Intel Corporation Investment Policy Committee et al
Plaintiff: Winston R. Anderson
Defendant: Intel Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, Todd Underwood, Ravi Jacob, Intel 401(k) Savings Plan, Tami Graham, Robert H. Swan, Reed E. Hundt, Ronald D. Dickel, Stuart Odell, Intel Corporation Investment Policy Committee, Cary Klafter, Finance Committee of the Intel Corporation Board of Directors, John J. Donahoe, Charlene Barshefsky, Christopher C. Geczy, Intel Retirement Contribution Plan, Richard Taylor, James D. Plummer, Arvind Sodhani, Terra Castaldi, Stacy Smith, Tiffany Doon Silva and David S. Pottruck
Case Number: 5:2019cv04618
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #68 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2020)
January 20, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14086123.) filed by Winston R. Anderson. (Porter, Gregory) (Filed on 1/20/2020)
November 13, 2019 ***Terminated Deadlines/Hearings per #65 Order. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 67 ADR Remark: Notice of Non-Compliance #66 withdrawn. Case is stayed #65 . (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 66 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #57 Stipulation.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #61 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #60 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice / Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Vidya Atre Mirmira ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13795171.) filed by Charlene Barshefsky, Terra Castaldi, Ronald D. Dickel, John J. Donahoe, Finance Committee of the Intel Corporation Board of Directors, Christopher C. Geczy, Tami Graham, Reed E. Hundt, Intel Corporation Investment Policy Committee, Intel Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, Ravi Jacob, Cary Klafter, Stuart Odell, James D. Plummer, David S. Pottruck, Tiffany Doon Silva, Stacy Smith, Arvind Sodhani, Robert H. Swan, Richard Taylor, Todd Underwood. (Mirmira, Vidya) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice / Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Daniel F. Katz ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13795165.) filed by Charlene Barshefsky, Terra Castaldi, Ronald D. Dickel, John J. Donahoe, Finance Committee of the Intel Corporation Board of Directors, Christopher C. Geczy, Tami Graham, Reed E. Hundt, Intel Corporation Investment Policy Committee, Intel Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, Ravi Jacob, Cary Klafter, Stuart Odell, James D. Plummer, David S. Pottruck, Tiffany Doon Silva, Stacy Smith, Arvind Sodhani, Robert H. Swan, Richard Taylor, Todd Underwood. (Katz, Daniel) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice / Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for John J. Buckley, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13795149.) filed by Charlene Barshefsky, Terra Castaldi, Ronald D. Dickel, John J. Donahoe, Finance Committee of the Intel Corporation Board of Directors, Christopher C. Geczy, Tami Graham, Reed E. Hundt, Intel Corporation Investment Policy Committee, Intel Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, Ravi Jacob, Cary Klafter, Stuart Odell, James D. Plummer, David S. Pottruck, Tiffany Doon Silva, Stacy Smith, Arvind Sodhani, Robert H. Swan, Richard Taylor, Todd Underwood. (Buckley, John) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 58 Certificate of Interested Entities by Charlene Barshefsky, Terra Castaldi, Ronald D. Dickel, John J. Donahoe, Finance Committee of the Intel Corporation Board of Directors, Christopher C. Geczy, Tami Graham, Reed E. Hundt, Intel Corporation Investment Policy Committee, Intel Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, Ravi Jacob, Cary Klafter, Stuart Odell, James D. Plummer, David S. Pottruck, Tiffany Doon Silva, Stacy Smith, Arvind Sodhani, Robert H. Swan, Richard Taylor, Todd Underwood (Cooper, Scott) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER // Joint Stipulation Regarding Stay of Action Pending the Supreme Court's Decision in a Related Case filed by Charlene Barshefsky, Terra Castaldi, Ronald D. Dickel, John J. Donahoe, Finance Committee of the Intel Corporation Board of Directors, Christopher C. Geczy, Tami Graham, Reed E. Hundt, Intel Corporation Investment Policy Committee, Intel Retirement Plans Administrative Committee, Ravi Jacob, Cary Klafter, Stuart Odell, James D. Plummer, David S. Pottruck, Tiffany Doon Silva, Stacy Smith, Arvind Sodhani, Robert H. Swan, Richard Taylor, Todd Underwood. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Scott) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 56 STIPULATION BY ALL PARTIES TO WAIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS filed by Winston R. Anderson. (Creitz, Joseph) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Winston R. Anderson. Service waived by David S. Pottruck waiver sent on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Winston R. Anderson. Service waived by Stuart Odell waiver sent on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 53 Summons Issued as to Todd Underwood. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 52 Summons Issued as to Tiffany Doon Silva. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 51 Summons Issued as to Terra Castaldi. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 50 Summons Issued as to Tami Graham. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 49 Summons Issued as to Stuart Odell. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 48 Summons Issued as to Stacy Smith. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 47 Summons Issued as to Ronald D. Dickel. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 46 Summons Issued as to Robert H. Swan. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 45 Summons Issued as to Richard Taylor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 44 Summons Issued as to Reed E. Hundt. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 43 Summons Issued as to Ravi Jacob. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 42 Summons Issued as to John J. Donahoe. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 41 Summons Issued as to James D. Plummer. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 40 Summons Issued as to Intel Retirement Plans Administrative Committee. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 39 Summons Issued as to Intel Retirement Contribution Plan. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 38 Summons Issued as to Finance Committee of the Intel Corporation Board of Directors. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 37 Summons Issued as to Intel Corporation Investment Policy Committee. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 36 Summons Issued as to Intel 401(k) Savings Plan. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 35 Summons Issued as to David S. Pottruck. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to Christopher C. Geczy. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 33 Summons Issued as to Charlene Barshefsky. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 32 Summons Issued as to Cary Klafter. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 31 Summons Issued as to Arvind Sodhani. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 30 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 29 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 28 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 27 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 26 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 25 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 24 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 23 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 22 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Barton, R.) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for November 20, 2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order assigned by Clerk on 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Winston R. Anderson.. (Creitz, Joseph) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/23/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13596863.). Filed byWinston R. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Barton, R.) (Filed on 8/9/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Intel Corporation Investment Policy Committee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Retirement Plans Administrative Committee
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Underwood
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravi Jacob
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel 401(k) Savings Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tami Graham
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H. Swan
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed E. Hundt
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Dickel
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Odell
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation Investment Policy Committee
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cary Klafter
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finance Committee of the Intel Corporation Board of Directors
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Donahoe
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Barshefsky
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher C. Geczy
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Retirement Contribution Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Taylor
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Plummer
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvind Sodhani
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terra Castaldi
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Smith
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Doon Silva
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Pottruck
Represented By: Scott P. Cooper
Represented By: Vidya Atre Mirmira
Represented By: John Joseph Buckley, Jr
Represented By: Daniel F. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston R. Anderson
Represented By: R. Joseph Barton
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Creitz
Represented By: Gregory Y. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?