Marinello v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Plaintiff: Rosario Marinello
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 5:2019cv04620
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Case Management Conference Date and ADR Schedule filed by Rosario Marinello. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rosario Marinello.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Remark - mailed copy of docket No. #6 and #7 to Rosario Marinello 418 Del Rosa Avenue Monterey, CA 93940 (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 returned as undeliverable re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,,.(RETURN TO SENDER - INSUFFICIENT ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Susan van Keulen granting #5 Motion for extension of time to pay filing fee. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION extension of time to pay filing fee re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, filed by Rosario Marinello. Responses due by 9/23/2019. Replies due by 9/30/2019. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS Plaintiff must pay the $400 filing fee no later than 30 days from the date of this order. Failure to pay the filing fee within 30 days will result in issuance of an order that this case be reassigned to a district judge along with a report and recommendation that the district judge dismiss this case with prejudice. Re: Dkt. No. #3 . Signed by Susan van Keulen on 8/14/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019) Modified on 8/19/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rosario Marinello. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 11 /5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Filed by (No Process, IFFP) Rosario Marinello. Consent/Declination due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marinello v. California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosario Marinello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?