Produce Pay, Inc. v. NewStar Fresh Foods, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Produce Pay, Inc.
Defendant: Big Idea Holdings, LLC, Carl R. Wiseman, Estrella Nueva, S. de R.L. de C.V., NewStar Fresh Foods, LLC, Newstar Fresh, LLC, Mitch R. Secondo, Organicgirl, LLC and Anthony E. Vasquez
Case Number: 5:2019cv04624
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Big Idea Holdings, LLC, Organicgirl, LLC.. (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Organicgirl, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Big Idea Holdings, LLC for Organicgirl, LLC. (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Big Idea Holdings, LLC, Organicgirl, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2019 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 10/21/2019. Replies due by 10/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jose Lua-Valencia, #2 Declaration of Colin T. Kemp, #3 Proposed Order)(Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings of Defendant Anthony E. Vasquez filed by Anthony E. Vasquez. (Barber, Stephan) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendants are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/15/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Produce Pay, Inc.. Big Idea Holdings, LLC served on 8/16/2019. (Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Produce Pay, Inc.. NewStar Fresh Foods, LLC served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Produce Pay, Inc.. Carl R. Wiseman served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Produce Pay, Inc.. Organicgirl, LLC served on 8/16/2019. (Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Produce Pay, Inc.. Estrella Nueva, S. de R.L. de C.V. served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Produce Pay, Inc.. Anthony E. Vasquez served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,, Stipulation Enlarging Defendants Big Idea Holdings, LLC and Organcgirl, LLC's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Big Idea Holdings, LLC, Organicgirl, LLC. (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Produce Pay, Inc... (Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Anthony E. Vasquez, Big Idea Holdings, LLC, Carl R. Wiseman, Estrella Nueva, S. de R.L. de C.V., NewStar Fresh Foods, LLC, Newstar Fresh, LLC, Organicgirl, LLC, Mitch R. Secondo. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Statement re #4 Statement CORRECTION OF DOCKET #4 by Produce Pay, Inc.. (Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/23/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 *Filing Error See dkt #6 for Correct document* Statement re #3 Statement First Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a) by Produce Pay, Inc. (Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 8/9/2019) Modified on 8/12/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Statement Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a) by Produce Pay, Inc.. (Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Newstar Fresh LLC, #2 Summons Organicgirl LLC, #3 Summons Big Idea Holdings, LLC, #4 Summons Estrella Nueva, #5 Summons Anthony E. Vasquez, #6 Summons Carl R. Wiseman, #7 Summons Mitch Secondo)(Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13597888.). Filed byProduce Pay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Produce Pay PACA License, #2 Exhibit B - Newstar Fresh Foods, LLC PACA License, #3 Exhibit C - Newstar Fresh Foods Sec. Of State Documents, #4 Exhibit D - Organicgirl, LLC Sec. Of State Docs, #5 Exhibit E - Organicgirl, LLC PACA License, #6 Exhibit F - Big Idea Holdings, LLC Sec. Of State Docs, #7 Exhibit G - Promissory Note and UCC, #8 Exhibit H - Estrella Nueva Corporate Docs, #9 Exhibit I - Unpaid Invoices, #10 Exhibit J - Personal Guaranty of Anthony E. Vasquez, #11 Exhibit K - Organicgirl Trademarks, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewicki, Alexander) (Filed on 8/9/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Produce Pay, Inc. v. NewStar Fresh Foods, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Idea Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Colin T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl R. Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estrella Nueva, S. de R.L. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewStar Fresh Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newstar Fresh, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch R. Secondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Organicgirl, LLC
Represented By: Colin T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony E. Vasquez
Represented By: Stephan Allen Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Produce Pay, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander James Demtro Lewicki
Represented By: Kathryn S. Diemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?