Bates v. Saul

Plaintiff: Gabrielle Bates
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv04639
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis AMENDED re DKT. 4 filed by Gabrielle Bates. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Judge name or initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #4 *** BLANK*** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gabrielle Bates (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019) Modified on 8/14/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 *** BLANK *** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gabrielle Bates. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 8/14/2019) Modified on 8/14/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT Please be advised that the filing fee has not been received in this case. The fee must be paid within two business days or the case will be subject to termination. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/26/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF DECISION OF COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (Administrative Procedure Act Case) against Andrew M. Saul. Filed byGabrielle Bates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 8/9/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Bates
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?