Williams et al v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Stewart and Andrea M Williams
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv04700
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Order re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint [Proposed] Order Granting Apple's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Apple, Inc.. (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple, Inc. re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Defendant Apple Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 10/18/2019. Replies due by 10/25/2019. (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Darcie Allison Tilly Notice of Appearance for Darcie A. Tilly (Tilly, Darcie) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Michael Brown Notice of Appearance for Matthew M. Brown (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Beatriz Mejia Notice of Appearance for Beatriz Mejia (Mejia, Beatriz) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Jessica Pomeroy Notice of Appearance for Lauren J. Pomeroy (Pomeroy, Lauren) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Azra Z. Mehdi (Mehdi, Azra) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea M Williams, James Stewart. Apple, Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Katriel, Roy) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety using correct event "Summons Returned Executed" Re: #7 Affidavit of Service, fil ed by James Stewart, Andrea M Williams (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Case Initiating Documents, and Standing Order served on Albert Damonte of CT Corporation Services, Registered Agent of Apple Inc. on 08/14/2019, filed by James Stewart, Andrea M Williams. (Katriel, Roy) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2019 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Stewart, Andrea M Williams.. (Katriel, Roy) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Katriel, Roy) (Filed on 8/12/2019)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13603839.). Filed byAndrea M Williams, James Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheer)(Katriel, Roy) (Filed on 8/12/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Jessica Pomeroy
Represented By: Matthew Michael Brown
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Represented By: Michelle Carrie Doolin
Represented By: Darcie Allison Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Stewart
Represented By: Roy Arie Katriel
Represented By: Azra Z. Mehdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea M Williams
Represented By: Roy Arie Katriel
Represented By: Azra Z. Mehdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?