Austero v. Saul
Plaintiff: Rodrigo I Austero
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv04708
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR STIPULATED STATEMENT OF FACTS. Re: Dkt. No #4 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/8/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rodrigo I Austero. Rodrigo I Austero served on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Lambert, Meghan) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rodrigo I Austero.. (Lambert, Meghan) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Kim, Esther) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/27/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lambert, Meghan) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13604488.). Filed byRodrigo I Austero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lambert, Meghan) (Filed on 8/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austero v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrigo I Austero
Represented By: Meghan O Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Esther Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?