Velodyne Lidar, Inc. v. Suteng Innovation Technology Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: Velodyne Lidar, Inc.
Defendant: Suteng Innovation Technology Co., Ltd. and Robosense
Case Number: 5:2019cv04746
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
2 Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Velodyne Lidar, Inc. (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order granting #21 Stipulation to Stay Case Pending ITC Investigation. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on December 19, 2019.The Clerk shall administratively close the file.(ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Case Pending ITC Investigation filed by Velodyne Lidar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Velodyne Lidar, Inc.. Service waived by Suteng Innovation Technology Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 2/20/2020. (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings re Related Case Order. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED RELATED CASE ORDER Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/16/2019. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 *** (typographical) ERROR *** please see #17 ORDER RELATING CASE to 16cv5251 EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/16/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019) Modified on 9/16/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CSAE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/30/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/29/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Velodyne Lidar, Inc... (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Young (Young, Patricia) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey G. Homrig (Homrig, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 complaint)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Suteng Innovation Technology Co., Ltd. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/28/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Velodyne Lidar, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Ford Motor Company, Other Affiliate Baidu, Inc. for Velodyne Lidar, Inc.. and L.R. 3-15 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons (Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Suteng Innovation Technology Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13607412.). Filed byVelodyne Lidar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lumish, Douglas) (Filed on 8/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velodyne Lidar, Inc. v. Suteng Innovation Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suteng Innovation Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robosense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velodyne Lidar, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas E. Lumish
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Homrig
Represented By: Patricia Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?