Caro Conde v. Barr
Petitioner: Agustin De Jesus Caro Conde
Respondent: M.D. William Barr and William Barr
Case Number: 5:2019cv04822
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal filed by William Barr. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 8/19/2019)
August 15, 2019 Set Hearing as to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO FILE RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; SETTING HEARING ON AUGUST 22, 2019 AT 9:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/15/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to William Barr, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by CLERK on 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/29/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Agustin De Jesus Caro Conde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Bond Hearing, #2 Exhibit IJ Order, #3 Exhibit DHS Opposition, #4 Exhibit BIA Appeal, #5 Exhibit Letter from Public Defender)(Schouten, Nienke) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Schouten, Nienke) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 0971-13612024.). Filed byAgustin De Jesus Caro Conde. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bond Motion, #2 Exhibit IJ Order, #3 Exhibit DHS Opposition, #4 Exhibit BIA Appeal, #5 Exhibit Letter from Public Defender, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Schouten, Nienke) (Filed on 8/14/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caro Conde v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Agustin De Jesus Caro Conde
Represented By: Nienke Schouten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M.D. William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Savith Iyengar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?