Ixchop Perez v. McAleenan et al
Defendant: Acting Director, DHS Matthew T. Albence, US Attorney General William Barr, Erik Bonnar and Kevin McAleenan
Petitioner: Mario Alexander Ixchop Perez
Case Number: 5:2019cv05191
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 Per ECF 7, finding as moot #5 Stipulation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Erik Bonnar, Kevin McAleenan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nino Gagelonia)(Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying as Moot #5 Stipulation; Granting #6 Stipulation re Briefing Schedule Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/16/2019. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Briefing Schedule filed by Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Erik Bonnar, Kevin McAleenan. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Mario Alexander Ixchop Perez. (Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Matthew T. Albence, William Barr, Erik Bonnar, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Edward J. Davila. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Immigration) ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 0971-13628798.). Filed byMario Alexander Ixchop Perez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Attny Dec and Table of Contents for Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit Exhibit R)(Friedman, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ixchop Perez v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director, DHS Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Pamela T. Johann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney General William Barr
Represented By: Pamela T. Johann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Bonnar
Represented By: Pamela T. Johann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Pamela T. Johann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mario Alexander Ixchop Perez
Represented By: Jennifer Taylor Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?