Tabak v. ABS-CBN International
Plaintiff: Alec Tabak
Defendant: ABS-CBN International
Case Number: 5:2019cv05202
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Second Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by ABS-CBN International. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S THIRD NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/25/2019. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #12 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Richard Liebowitz. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13760132.) filed by Alec Tabak. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ABS-CBN International.. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/10/2019. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #8 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Burt Braverman. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Burt Braverman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13713998.) filed by ABS-CBN International. (Attachments: #1 Braverman Certificate of Good Standing)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by ABS-CBN International. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/23/2019. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ABS-CBN International. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/4/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABS-CBN International ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13631298.). Filed byAlec Tabak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Filed on 8/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tabak v. ABS-CBN International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABS-CBN International
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: Burt A Braverman,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alec Tabak
Represented By: Richard P Liebowitz
Represented By: Gregory Peter Goonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?