Patel v. New York Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MANDAKINI PATEL
Defendant: New York Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv05321
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case, Reassignment Order signed Clerk on 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by New York Life Insurance Company.. (Swick, Jodi) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendant is requested to consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/15/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by New York Life Insurance Company (Higbee, Charan) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Time to Respond filed by New York Life Insurance Company. (Swick, Jodi) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mandakini Patel.. (Shaffman, Scott) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mandakini Patel (Shaffman, Scott) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to New York Life Insurance Company. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/27/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/9/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Shaffman, Scott) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13644712.). Filed byMANDAKINI PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shaffman, Scott) (Filed on 8/23/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. New York Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Charan M. Higbee
Represented By: Jodi Krystyn Swick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANDAKINI PATEL
Represented By: Scott E. Shaffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?