Nguyen et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Tan Nguyen and Nam Nguyen
Defendant: Paso Robles Ford, Ford Motor Company and DOES 1 though 10, inclusive
Case Number: 5:2019cv05541
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob William Cutler (Cutler, Jacob) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anh X Nguyen (Nguyen, Anh) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/11/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Edward M. Chen. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byFord Motor Company, Paso Robles Ford. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/18/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Paso Robles Ford re 1 Notice of Removal,, (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. for Ford Motor Company. re 1 Notice of Removal,, (Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 19CV352018. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13671693). Filed byPaso Robles Ford, Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Ntc of Service of Process, #2 Exhibit B-Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Superior Court Summons, #4 Exhibit D-Answer OBO Ford, #5 Exhibit E-Answer OBO Paso Robles Ford, #6 Exhibit F-Ford's 2017 10-K Filing Excerpt, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 of Counsel In Support of Removal)(Harlow, Charles) (Filed on 9/3/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tan Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nam Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paso Robles Ford
Represented By: Charles Frederick Harlow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Charles Frederick Harlow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 though 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?