Omni MedSci, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Omni MedSci, Inc.
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Donald E Tiller
Case Number: 5:2019cv05673
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 168 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 167 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00429. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 4, 2019 Filing 166 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Melissa R. Smith and Harry L. Gillam, Jr. by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting #164 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas John Ward, Jr; Andrea Leigh Fair and Claire Abernathy Henry terminated. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/4/2019. (ch, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 164 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea)
August 23, 2019 Filing 163 REDACTION to 154 Sealed Order. (nkl, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 162 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #153 Order Defendant and Counter Claimant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Compliance (Yang, Irene)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #160 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION REGARDING SEALED ORDERS. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/22/19. (ch, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 160 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION REGARDING SEALED ORDERS by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 21, 2019 Filing 159 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION REGARDING SEALED ORDERS by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 8/22/2019 (klc, ).
August 20, 2019 Filing 158 NOTICE by Omni MedSci, Inc. re #153 Order to Pay Technical Adviser Donald Tiller (Lewry, Thomas)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #156 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/16/2019. (klc, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 156 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Transfer to the Northern District of California by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER re Sealed Orders. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/14/2019. (nkl, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER to Pay Technical Advisor. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/14/2019. (nkl, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/14/2019. (nkl, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 150 REDACTION to #145 Sealed Patent Document (Corrected) Omni's Brief Responding to Apple's Supplemental Claim Construction Brief by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K - USPN 10215698, #2 Exhibit L - USPN 9891098, #3 Exhibit M - Confidential & only filed under seal)(Lewry, Thomas)
August 12, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 146, REDACTION. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 149 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Omni MedSci, Inc. for proceedings held on 7-16-2019 Markman & Motions before Judge Robert Schroeder III. (Lewry, Thomas) Forwarded to official court reporter, Anna Lafrenz on 8/8/2019. Modified on 8/8/2019 (bjc, ).
August 7, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion hearing held on July 16, 2019 before Judge Robert William Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anna Renken Lafrenz. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 8/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2019. (bjc, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman hearing held on 7/16/2019 before Judge Robert William Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anna Renken Lafrenz. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 8/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2019. (bjc, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 146 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***REDACTION to #145 Sealed Patent Document Omni's Brief Responding to Apple's Supplemental Claim Construction Brief by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K - USPN 10215698, #2 Exhibit L - USPN 9891098, #3 Exhibit M - Confidential & only filed under seal)(Lewry, Thomas) Modified on 8/12/2019 (ch, ).
August 5, 2019 Filing 145 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K - US Patent 10215698, #2 Exhibit L - US Patent 9891098, #3 Exhibit M - Waydo Deposition Transcript excerpt)(Lewry, Thomas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE by Apple Inc. REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF (Smith, Melissa)
July 29, 2019 Filing 143 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Apple Inc. for proceedings held on 07/16/2019, Markman Hearing and Motion Hearing re #90 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing before Judge District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Conaty, Kelley) Forwarded to official court reporter, Anna R Lafrenz on 7/29/2019.
July 23, 2019 Filing 142 REDACTION Notice of Filing Motion to Dismiss Hearing Slides by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Omni's Motion to Dismiss Hearing Slides)(Lewry, Thomas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 141 REDACTION Notice of Filing Hearing Presentation by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa)
July 18, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE by Omni MedSci, Inc. Notice of Filing Claim Construction Hearing Slides (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Omni's Markman Hearing Slides)(Lewry, Thomas)
July 18, 2019 Filing 139 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE OF FILING MOTION HEARING SLIDES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CONFIDENTIAL - Omni's Motion Hearing Slides)(Lewry, Thomas)
July 18, 2019 Filing 138 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.NOTICE OF FILING OF HEARING PRESENTATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa)
July 18, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Filing Hearing Presentation (Attachments: #1 Markman Presentation)(Smith, Melissa)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE****TEXT ONLY ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the mediation deadline set in Docket No. 202 is STAYED until 30 days after the Court's ruling on Docket No. 177. So Ordered by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III on 7/16/2019. (bas) Modified on 7/18/2019 (lfs, ).
July 16, 2019 Filing 136 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Markman Hearing and Motion Hearing re #90 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Apple Inc. held on 7/16/2019. (Court Reporter Anna Lefranz) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
July 15, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE by Omni MedSci, Inc. re #90 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing (of Omni MedSci's Additional Evidence) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P1-P6 - Certificates of Service for IPR Case Nos. 2019-00910, 2019-00911, 2019-00913, 2019-00914, 2019-00916 and 2019-00917, #2 Exhibit Q - Declaration of John LeRoy)(Le Roy, John)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #122 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kathi A Cover terminated. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/10/2019. (ch, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 133 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #125 Claim Construction Brief, of Errata to Defendant's Responsive Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lee, Sharon)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #131 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File its Claim Construction Reply Brief on July 1, 2019 re 129 Reply to Claim Construction Brief. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/3/2019. (ch, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 131 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File its Claim Construction Reply Brief on July 1, 2019 re #129 Reply to Claim Construction Brief by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas)
July 1, 2019 Filing 130 Joint P.R. 4-5(d) Claim Construction Chart by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Smith, Christopher)
July 1, 2019 Filing 129 REPLY to #125 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Lewry, Thomas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE by Omni MedSci, Inc. (Joint Notice) of Estimated Time for Markman Hearing (Smith, Christopher)
June 25, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hamilton Cooper Simpson on behalf of Apple Inc. (Simpson, Hamilton)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Setting ORAL Hearing on Motion #112 Joint MOTION for Hearing re #90 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing : Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2019 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/24/2019. (ch, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 125 DEFENDANT AND COUNTER CLAIMANT APPLE INC.'S RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Conaty, Kelley)
June 21, 2019 Filing 124 REDACTION to #116 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O - Islam, Mohammed 5-14-19 Dep Trans Excerpt)(Lewry, Thomas)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER re #119 Stipulation filed by Omni MedSci, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/21/2019. (nkl, ) Modified on 6/24/2019 (nkl, ).
June 20, 2019 Filing 122 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney KATHI A. COVER by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #118 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Redacted Version of Surreply (Dkt. #90). Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/20/2019. (ch, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER - appointing Donald E. Tiller as technical advisor. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/19/2019. (ch, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 119 STIPULATION Dismissing U.S. Patent No. 9,885,698 by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas)
June 18, 2019 Filing 118 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Redacted Version of Surreply (Dkt. #90) by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas)
June 17, 2019 Filing 117 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #91 Opposed SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue (ECF No. 67) and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing (ECF No. 90) filed by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Lewry, Thomas)
June 17, 2019 Filing 116 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #90 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Omni MedSci, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O - CONFIDENTIAL Islam, Mohammed 5-14-19 Dep Trans Excerpt)(Lewry, Thomas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Ripeness Regarding Motion to Transfer (ECF No.67), Motion to Stay (ECF No. 71), and Renewed Motion to Stay (ECF No. 91) (Conaty, Kelley)
June 11, 2019 Filing 114 REDACTION to #111 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue [ECF No. 67] and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing [ECF No. 90] by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 6)(Conaty, Kelley)
June 11, 2019 Filing 113 REDACTION to #110 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Apple Inc.. (Conaty, Kelley)
June 7, 2019 Filing 112 Joint MOTION for Hearing re #90 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
June 7, 2019 Filing 111 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #91 Opposed SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue (ECF No. 67) and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing (ECF No. 90) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Errata 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Conaty, Kelley)
June 7, 2019 Filing 110 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #90 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 46)(Conaty, Kelley)
June 4, 2019 Filing 109 REDACTION to #107 Sealed Response to Motion by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 286, 040 Assignment, #2 Exhibit B - 533 Assignment, #3 Exhibit D - Islam Dep 5-15-19, #4 Exhibit E - Pilz Dep Ex 45, #5 Exhibit F - Islam Dep 5-14-19, #6 Exhibit H - UM launches health study using Apple Watch, #7 Exhibit I - 1992 Islam Supp Appointment, #8 Exhibit J - Pilz 2012 Article, #9 Exhibit K - Visiting Scholar IP Agreement 2014, #10 Exhibit L - Visiting Scholar Agreement (OGC June 2016), #11 Exhibit M - Invention Report (2016), #12 Exhibit N - 2013 Email re Patent Applications, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas)
June 4, 2019 Filing 108 REDACTION to #102 Sealed Document,, by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USPN 9861286, #2 Exhibit B - USPN 10098546, #3 Exhibit C - USPN 10188299, #4 Exhibit D - USPN 10213113, #5 Exhibit E - American Heritage 5th Ed., #6 Exhibit F - Merriam Webster 11th Ed., #7 Exhibit H - Dielectric Filters Reynard Corporation, #8 Exhibit I - Definition of Phase at Dictionary.com, #9 Exhibit J - Definition of Frequency at Dictionary.com)(Lewry, Thomas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 107 SEALED RESPONSE (Corrected) to Motion re #90 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Lewry, Thomas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Compliance Regarding Technology Tutorial (Conaty, Kelley)
May 31, 2019 Filing 105 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #90 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 286, 040 Assignment, #2 Exhibit B - 533 Assignment, #3 Exhibit C - Pilz Dep, #4 Exhibit D - Islam Dep 5-15-19, #5 Exhibit E - Pilz Dep Ex 45, #6 Exhibit F- Islam Dep 5-14-19, #7 Exhibit G - UM-Apple Collaboration, #8 Exhibit H - UM launches health study using Apple Watch, #9 Exhibit I - 1992 Islam Supp Appointment, #10 Exhibit J - Pilz 2012 article, #11 Exhibit K - Visiting Scholar IP Agreement 2014, #12 Exhibit L - Visiting Scholar Agreement (OGC June 2016), #13 Exhibit M - Invention Report 2016, #14 Exhibit N - 2013 Email re Patent Applications, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Compliance Preliminary Election of Prior Art (Conaty, Kelley)
May 31, 2019 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re #91 Opposed SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue (ECF No. 67) and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing (ECF No. 90) filed by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 10-01-18 Apple Subpoena to U of M, #2 Exhibit B - Omni Med Sci v Apple Document Production, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 102 Sealed Document Opening Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USPN 9861286, #2 Exhibit B - USPN 10098546, #3 Exhibit C - USPN 10188299, #4 Exhibit D - USPN 10213113, #5 Exhibit E - American Heritage 5th Ed., #6 Exhibit F - Merriam Webster 11th Ed., #7 Exhibit G - Citrine ASIC ERS, #8 Exhibit H - Dielectric Filters Reynard Corp., #9 Exhibit I - Definition of Phase at Dictionary.com, #10 Exhibit J - Definition of Frequency at Dictionary.com)(Lewry, Thomas) Modified on 5/31/2019 (ch, ).
May 30, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE by Omni MedSci, Inc. Joint Notice of Proposed Technical Advisor (Fair, Andrea)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - granting #95 Joint Motion to Amended Docket Control Order Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2020 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Jury Selection set for 4/20/2020 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Jury Trial set for 4/20/2020 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Markman Hearing set for 7/16/2019 10:00 AM in (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2020 10:00 AM in (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Motions due by 3/24/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/24/2020.. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/28/209. (ch, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE by Omni MedSci, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Service of Preliminary Election of Asserted Claims (Lewry, Thomas)
May 21, 2019 Filing 98 REDACTION to #91 Opposed SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue (ECF No. 67) and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing (ECF No. 90) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
May 21, 2019 Filing 97 REDACTION to #90 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12, #7 Exhibit 13, #8 Exhibit 14, #9 Exhibit 15, #10 Exhibit 22, #11 Exhibit 24, #12 Exhibit 25, #13 Exhibit 32, #14 Exhibit 33, #15 Exhibit 38, #16 Exhibit 45, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
May 20, 2019 Filing 96 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to P.R. 4-3 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Conaty, Kelley)
May 20, 2019 Filing 95 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 20, 2019 Filing 94 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: Notice of Corrected Exhibit to #90 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit 44)(Conaty, Kelley)
May 20, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE by Omni MedSci, Inc. of Compliance with PR 4-2 - Amended Disclosures (Lewry, Thomas)
May 17, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Conaty, Kelley)
May 17, 2019 Filing 91 Opposed SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue (ECF No. 67) and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing (ECF No. 90) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
May 17, 2019 Filing 90 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2A, #3 Exhibit 2B, #4 Exhibit 2C, #5 Exhibit 2D, #6 Exhibit 2E, #7 Exhibit 2F, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23, #29 Exhibit 24, #30 Exhibit 25, #31 Exhibit 26, #32 Exhibit 27, #33 Exhibit 28, #34 Exhibit 29, #35 Exhibit 30, #36 Exhibit 31, #37 Exhibit 32, #38 Exhibit 33, #39 Exhibit 34, #40 Exhibit 35, #41 Exhibit 36, #42 Exhibit 37, #43 Exhibit 38, #44 Exhibit 39, #45 Exhibit 40, #46 Errata 41, #47 Exhibit 42, #48 Exhibit 43, #49 Exhibit 44, #50 Exhibit 45, #51 Text of Proposed Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
May 17, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE by Omni MedSci, Inc. of Compliance with PR 4-2 Disclosures (Lewry, Thomas)
May 10, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Compliance of P.R. 4-1 (Conaty, Kelley)
May 10, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathi A Cover on behalf of Apple Inc. (Cover, Kathi)
May 1, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brooke S. Zarouri on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7250782. (Zarouri, Brooke)
April 29, 2019 Filing 85 REDACTION to #67 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue, #84 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O - Prelim. Claim Construction, #2 Exhibit P - Apple's Rulkov Charts, #3 Exhibit Q - email chain)(Le Roy, John)
April 25, 2019 Filing 84 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #67 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit O - Prelim. Claim Construction, #2 Exhibit P - Apple's Rulkov Charts, #3 Exhibit Q - email chain)(Le Roy, John)
April 24, 2019 Filing 83 REPLY to Response to Motion re #71 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
April 24, 2019 Filing 82 REDACTION to #79 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit HH)(Smith, Melissa)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #80 Unopposed Motion to Extend Redaction Deadline.. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/23/2019. (klc, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Redaction Deadline by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 18, 2019 Filing 79 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #67 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit GG, #2 Exhibit HH, #3 Exhibit II, #4 Exhibit JJ, #5 Exhibit KK, #6 Exhibit LL)(Conaty, Kelley)
April 17, 2019 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #71 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AMENDED DISCOVERY ORDER granting #75 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/16/2019. (ch, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 76 ANSWER to #69 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim to Second Amended Complaint by Omni MedSci, Inc..(Lewry, Thomas)
April 15, 2019 Filing 75 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Discovery Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 12, 2019 Filing 74 REDACTION to #73 Sealed Response to Motion,,,, Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A [REDACTED] - Jaynes Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Confidential - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit C - Statesman article re Apple's Austin has nearly 7,000 workers, #5 Exhibit D - Confidential - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit E - Texas Instruments Locations, #7 Exhibit F - Confidential - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit G - Confidential - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit H - Omni Subpoenas to Maxim and TI, #10 Exhibit I - Confidential - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit J - Confidential - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit K - Confidential - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #13 Exhibit L - Confidential - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL, #14 Exhibit M - Apple Subpoena to AMS-TAOS-USA, #15 Exhibit N - Confidential - ONLY FILED UNDER SEAL)(Le Roy, John)
April 11, 2019 Filing 73 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #67 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A [CONFIDENTIAL] - Jaynes Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Jaynes, Michael 12.07.18 Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit C - Statesman article re Apple's Austin has nearly 7,000 workers, #5 Exhibit D - [CONFIDENTIAL] 2019-01-11 2d Suppl. Responses to Omni's Interrogatories, #6 Exhibit E - Texas Instruments Locations, #7 Exhibit F - Land, Brian 02.08.19 Deposition Transcript, #8 Exhibit G [CONFIDENTIAL] - N27A Platinum Chipset and Function ERS, #9 Exhibit H - Omni Subpoenas to Maxim and TI, #10 Exhibit I [CONFIDENTIAL] - Series 1 (APL-OMNI 40433-40492), #11 Exhibit J [CONFIDENTIAL] - Series 2 (APL-OMNI 32231-32370), #12 Exhibit K [CONFIDENTIAL] - Series 3 (APL-OMNI 60978-61093), #13 Exhibit L [CONFIDENTIAL] - Series 4 (APL-OMNI 134824-134924), #14 Exhibit M - Apple Subpoena to AMS-TAOS-USA, #15 Exhibit N [CONFIDENTIAL] (APL-OMNI 69528))(Le Roy, John)
April 4, 2019 Filing 72 REDACTION to #71 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
April 2, 2019 Filing 71 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
April 1, 2019 Filing 70 REDACTION to #67 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 (Part 1 of 4), #2 Exhibit A-1 (Part 2 of 4), #3 Exhibit A-1 (Part 3 of 4), #4 Exhibit A-1 (Part 4 of 4), #5 Exhibit A-2, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit O, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Exhibit Q, #17 Exhibit Y, #18 Exhibit AA, #19 Exhibit BB, #20 Exhibit CC, #21 Exhibit EE, #22 Exhibit FF, #23 Declaration of Michael Jaynes, #24 Text of Proposed Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
April 1, 2019 Filing 69 Defendant and Counter Claimant Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to #52 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Omni MedSci, Inc. by Apple Inc..(Conaty, Kelley)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #66 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order filed by Apple Inc.., SCHEDULING ORDER:( Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2020 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Amended Pleadings due by 12/10/2019., Jury Selection set for 4/20/2020 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Jury Trial set for 4/20/2020 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Markman Hearing set for 7/16/2019 10:00 AM in (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2020 10:00 AM in (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Motions due by 3/24/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/24/2020. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/29/2019. (ch, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 67 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 (Part 1 of 4), #2 Exhibit A-1 (Part 2 of 4), #3 Exhibit A-1 (Part 3 of 4), #4 Exhibit A-1 (Part 4 of 4), #5 Exhibit A-2, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit T, #25 Exhibit U, #26 Exhibit V, #27 Exhibit W, #28 Exhibit X, #29 Exhibit Y, #30 Exhibit Z, #31 Exhibit AA, #32 Exhibit BB, #33 Exhibit CC, #34 Exhibit DD, #35 Exhibit EE, #36 Exhibit FF, #37 Declaration of Michael Jaynes, #38 Text of Proposed Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
March 27, 2019 Filing 66 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
March 25, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 4/1/2019. 6 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 65 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint re Apple Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
March 25, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Omni MedSci, Inc. Regarding Corrected Initial Disclosures (Lewry, Thomas)
March 25, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Omni MedSci, Inc. Regarding FRCP 26(a)(1) & 1 and 3 of Discovery Order (Lewry, Thomas)
March 25, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Omni MedSci, Inc. Regarding Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Lewry, Thomas)
March 25, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Omni MedSci, Inc. Regarding Initial Disclosures (Lewry, Thomas)
March 20, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc. Regarding Initial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #55 Unopposed MOTION TO RESCHEDULE MARKMAN HEARING. Markman Hearing set for 7/16/2019 10:00 AM in (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/15/19. (ch, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 58 ANSWER to #50 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Omni MedSci, Inc..(Lewry, Thomas)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #53 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order. Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2020 10:00 AM in (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Amended Pleadings due by 4/24/2019., Discovery due by 5/22/2019., Jury Selection set for 4/20/2020 09:00 AM in(Marshall) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Jury Trial set for 4/20/2020 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Markman Hearing set for 7/10/2019 10:00 AM in (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2020 10:00 AM in (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Motions due by 3/24/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/24/2020. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/12/2019. (ch, )
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #51 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct and File Second Amended Complaint. ORDERED that the Second Amended Complaint is deemed to have been filed. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/12/2019. (ch, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION TO RESCHEDULE MARKMAN HEARING by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #49 MOTION Joint Motion to Appoint Mediator. Honorable David Folsom, Jackson Walker LLP, 6002B Summerfield Drive, Texarkana, TX 75503, 903-255-3251, dfolsom@jw.com, is appointed as mediator. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/6/2019. (ch, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 53 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT (2nd Amended) against Apple Inc., filed by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USPN 10098546, #2 Exhibit B - USPN 9861286, #3 Exhibit C - USPN 9885698, #4 Exhibit D - USPN 10188299, #5 Exhibit E - USPN 10213113)(Lewry, Thomas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct and File Second Amended Complaint by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas)
February 19, 2019 Filing 50 ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Omni MedSci, Inc. by Apple Inc..(Conaty, Kelley)
February 14, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION Joint Motion to Appoint Mediator by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewry, Thomas)
February 14, 2019 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 48 submitted Didn't comply. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 48 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT***NOTICE by Omni MedSci, Inc. & Apple Inc. of an Agreed Mediator (Lewry, Thomas) Modified on 2/14/2019 (ch, ).
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint. Apple Inc. answer due 2/19/2019. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/12/2019. (ch, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
February 11, 2019 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Omni MedSci, Inc.. Apple Inc. served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Fair, Andrea)
February 11, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. ENTER DATE RETURNED Document # 44, Summons returned Executed. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 44 ***FILED IN ERROR***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Fair, Andrea) Modified on 2/11/2019 (ch, ).
February 5, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 43, Opposed SEALED MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 43 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Opposed SEALED MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) Modified on 2/5/2019 (nkl, ).
January 28, 2019 Filing 42 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Apple Inc., filed by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USPN 10098546, #2 Exhibit B - USPN 9861286, #3 Exhibit C - USPN 9885698, #4 Exhibit D - Issue Notification for USPN 10188299)(Le Roy, John)
January 24, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sharon Lee on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7109552. (Lee, Sharon)
January 9, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David T Pritikin on behalf of Apple Inc. (Pritikin, David)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DISCOVERY ORDER granting #33 Amended MOTION to Enter Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/18/2018. (ch, )
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - GRANTING #30 Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2020 10:00 AM in (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Amended Pleadings due by 4/24/2019., Discovery due by 5/15/2019., Jury Selection set for 4/20/2020 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Jury Trial set for 4/20/2020 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Markman Hearing set for 7/10/2019 10:00 AM in (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2020 10:00 AM in (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Motions due by 3/24/2020., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/24/2020.). Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/18/2018. (ch, )
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 E-DISCOVERY ORDER granting #29 Joint MOTION for Entry of ESI Order. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/18/2018. (ch, )
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying #28 Joint Motion for Entry of Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/18/2018. (ch, )
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS #27 MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/18/2018. (ch, )
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - The scheduling conference is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/18/18. (ch, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 33 Amended MOTION to Enter Discovery Order , Joint by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Case Orders. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/17/2018. (ch, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of Apple Inc. (Gillam, Harry)
December 14, 2018 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
December 14, 2018 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Entry of ESI Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order E-Discovery Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
December 14, 2018 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for Discovery Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
December 14, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Protective Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Protective Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
December 13, 2018 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Orders by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Orders. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/13/2018. (ch, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Orders by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conaty, Kelley)
November 29, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Omni MedSci, Inc..(Lewry, Thomas)
November 26, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas A Broughan, III on behalf of Apple Inc. (Broughan, Thomas)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2018 02:15 PM before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/24/2018. (nkl, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Apple Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
November 8, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey P Kushan on behalf of Apple Inc. (Kushan, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ching-Lee Fukuda on behalf of Apple Inc. (Fukuda, Ching-Lee)
November 8, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Irene I Yang on behalf of Apple Inc. (Yang, Irene)
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelley Anne Conaty on behalf of Apple Inc. (Conaty, Kelley)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Apple Inc.. (Conaty, Kelley)
November 8, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. (Conaty, Kelley)
November 8, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 13 Defendant and Counter Claimant Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Omni MedSci, Inc. by Apple Inc..(Conaty, Kelley)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Omni MedSci, Inc. (Ward, Thomas)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Leigh Fair on behalf of Omni MedSci, Inc. (Fair, Andrea)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Omni MedSci, Inc. (Henry, Claire)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert C J Tuttle on behalf of Omni MedSci, Inc. (Tuttle, Robert)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Halan on behalf of Omni MedSci, Inc. (Halan, John)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher C Smith on behalf of Omni MedSci, Inc. (Smith, Christopher)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas A Lewry on behalf of Omni MedSci, Inc. (Lewry, Thomas)
October 16, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
October 16, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (ch, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc.. (ch, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Le Roy, John)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Le Roy, John)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Omni MedSci, Inc. (Le Roy, John)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6984180.), filed by Omni MedSci, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - USPN 10,098,546 Issue Notification, #3 Exhibit B - US9861286-Dental3, #4 Exhibit C - US9885698-Glucose2)(Le Roy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omni MedSci, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Lee
Represented By: Irene I Yang
Represented By: Kelley Anne Conaty
Represented By: David T Pritikin
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Brooke S. Zarouri
Represented By: Kathi A Cover
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey P Kushan
Represented By: Thomas A Broughan, III
Represented By: Hamilton Cooper Simpson
Represented By: Ching-Lee Fukuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Donald E Tiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omni MedSci, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C J Tuttle
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Represented By: Christopher C Smith
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Halan
Represented By: Nancy Claire Abernathy
Represented By: Thomas A Lewry
Represented By: John S Le Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?