Fernandez et al v. General Motors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Linda Hernandez and John Fernandez
Defendant: Motors Liquidation Corporation, General Motors, LLC and General Motors Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv06338
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUESTING INFORMATION FROM PLAINTIFFS IN PREPARATION FOR INITIAL CMC. Re: ECF 1 . Plaintiffs are ordered to respond to questions by December 6. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/8/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Fernandez, Linda Hernandez.. (Shea, Michael) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/5/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by General Motors, LLC.. (Matayoshi, Kelly) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by General Motors, LLC Certificate of Service (Notice of Assignment, Order re Initial Case Management Conference, Standing Orders, Pamphlet re Consenting to Magistrate Judge) (Matayoshi, Kelly) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by General Motors, LLC re #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, Certificate of Service (Matayoshi, Kelly) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors, LLC identifying Other Affiliate General Motors, LLC for General Motors, LLC. General Motors, LLC's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Matayoshi, Kelly) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by General Motors, LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019) Modified on 10/4/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/17/2019. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by General Motors, LLC re 1 Notice of Removal, (Matayoshi, Kelly) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 19CV351016. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13763447). Filed byGeneral Motors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Matayoshi, Kelly) (Filed on 10/3/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez et al v. General Motors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Hernandez
Represented By: Mark B. O'Connor
Represented By: Michael Murt Shea, Jr
Represented By: Mark B. O'Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fernandez
Represented By: Mark B. O'Connor
Represented By: Michael Murt Shea, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motors Liquidation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Kelly M Matayoshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?