Pikal v. Dropbox, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bryan Pikal
Defendant: R. Bryan Schreier, Jefferies LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Andrew W. Houston, Sequoia Technology Partners XII, L.P., Dropbox, Inc., Arash Ferdowsi, Allen & Company LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Margaret C. Whitman, Piper Jaffray & Co., Condoleezza Rice, Donald W. Blair, Ajay V. Vashee, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Robert J. Mylod, Jr., Timothy J. Regan, Sequoia Capital XII, L.P., Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Paul E. Jacobs, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Canaccord Genuity LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, SC XII Management, LLC and RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv06360
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
2 Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 "For Further Docket Entries See Lead Consolidated Case, 5:19-cv-06348-BLF." (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER CONSOLIDATING SECURITIES CLASS ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/16/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Bryan Pikal. Service waived by Allen & Company LLC waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Donald W. Blair waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Canaccord Genuity LLC waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Arash Ferdowsi waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Andrew W. Houston waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; J.P. Morgan Securities LLC waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; JMP Securities LLC waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Paul E. Jacobs waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Jefferies LLC waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Robert J. Mylod, Jr. waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Piper Jaffray & Co. waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; RBC Capital Markets, LLC waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Timothy J. Regan waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Condoleezza Rice waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; SC XII Management, LLC waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; R. Bryan Schreier waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Sequoia Capital XII, L.P. waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Sequoia Technology Partners XII, L.P. waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Ajay V. Vashee waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Margaret C. Whitman waiver sent on 1/7/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 A. Houston Waiver, #2 A. Vashee Waiver, #3 C. Rice Waiver, #4 D. Blair Waiver, #5 M. Whitman Waiver, #6 P. Jacobs Waiver, #7 R. Mylod Waiver, #8 R. Schreier Waiver, #9 T. Regan Waiver, #10 SC XII LP Waiver, #11 SC XII MGMT Waiver, #12 SC XII Principals Fund Waiver, #13 Sequoia Technology Waiver, #14 Allen & Company Waiver, #15 Canaccord Genuity Waiver, #16 Deutsche Bank Waiver, #17 Goldman Sachs Waiver, #18 J.P. Morgan Waiver, #19 Jefferies Waiver, #20 JMP Securities Waiver, #21 Keybanc Waiver, #22 Macquarie Waiver, #23 Merrill Lynch Waiver, #24 Piper Waiver, #25 RBC Capital Waiver)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 31 Statement in Support re #17 Order, Plaintiff's Statement in Support of Consolidation by Bryan Pikal. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 1/15/2020) Modified on 1/16/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2020 Filing 30 Statement of Assent to Consolidation by Allen & Company LLC, Canaccord Genuity LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Close, Matthew) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 29 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Allen & Company LLC, Canaccord Genuity LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC / Underwriter Defendants' Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 3-15 (Close, Matthew) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W Close on behalf of Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC; J.P. Morgan Securities LLC; Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.; Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated; Allen & Company LLC; RBC Capital Markets, LLC; Jefferies LLC; Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.; Canaccord Genuity LLC; JMP Securities LLC; Keybanc Capital Markets Inc.; and Piper Jaffray & Co. (Close, Matthew) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 27 Statement of Non-Opposition re #17 Order, filed bySC XII Management, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII, L.P., Sequoia Technology Partners XII, L.P.. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Zhang, Shuang) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 26 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by SC XII Management, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII, L.P., Sequoia Technology Partners XII, L.P. (Zhang, Shuang) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by SC XII Management, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII, L.P., Sequoia Technology Partners XII, L.P. (Zhang, Shuang) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Shuang Zhang (Zhang, Shuang) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Jane Brewer (Brewer, Linda) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr (Olivar, Harry) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 21 Statement of Non-Opposition and Assent to Consolidation filed byDonald W. Blair, Dropbox, Inc., Arash Ferdowsi, Andrew W. Houston, Paul E. Jacobs, Robert J. Mylod, Jr., Timothy J. Regan, Condoleezza Rice, R. Bryan Schreier, Ajay V. Vashee, Margaret C. Whitman. (Locker, Nina) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Donald W. Blair, Dropbox, Inc., Arash Ferdowsi, Andrew W. Houston, Paul E. Jacobs, Robert J. Mylod, Jr., Timothy J. Regan, Condoleezza Rice, R. Bryan Schreier, Ajay V. Vashee, Margaret C. Whitman identifying Other Affiliate Hartford, Other Affiliate RLI Insurance Company, Other Affiliate AIG, Other Affiliate FMR LLC, Other Affiliate Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Co., Other Affiliate Beazley Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Chubb, Other Affiliate Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, Other Affiliate Accel X L.P., Other Affiliate Accel X Strategic Partners L.P., Other Affiliate Accel Investors 2008 LLC, Other Affiliate Accel Investors 2010 LLC, Other Affiliate Accel XI LP, Other Affiliate Accel XI Strategic Partners LP, Other Affiliate Accel Leaders Fund LP, Other Affiliate Chubb Bermuda Insurance Ltd., Other Affiliate Endurance American Specialty (U.S.), Other Affiliate Freedom Specialty, Other Affiliate Swiss Reinsurance, Other Affiliate Tokyo Marine HCC, Other Affiliate Travelers Casualty & Surety Co., Other Affiliate Accel Leaders Fund Associates L.L.C., Other Affiliate Accel Leaders Fund Investors 2016 L.L.C., Other Affiliate Accel X Associates L.L.C., Other Affiliate Accel XI Associates L.L.C., Other Affiliate Accel Investors 2013 L.L.C., Other Affiliate Allied World Assurance Company (U.S.), Other Affiliate Berkley Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Markel American Insurance Company for Dropbox, Inc.. (Locker, Nina) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 19 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Dropbox, Inc. (Locker, Nina) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Nina F. Locker for Dropbox Defendants (Locker, Nina) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUESTING THE PARTIES TO INFORM THE COURT OF THEIR RESPECTIVE POSITIONS ON CONSOLIDATION OF SECURITIES CLASS ACTIONS NO LATER THAN JANUARY 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/9/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings re 64 Order Relating Securities Class Actions. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/8/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE TO SERVE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/6/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Bryan Pikal. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bryan Pikal. Dropbox, Inc. served on 1/3/2020, answer due 1/24/2020. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Allen & Company LLC, Donald W. Blair, Canaccord Genuity LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dropbox, Inc., Arash Ferdowsi, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Andrew W. Houston, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Paul E. Jacobs, Jefferies LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Robert J. Mylod, Jr., Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Timothy J. Regan, Condoleezza Rice, SC XII Management, LLC, R. Bryan Schreier, Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII, L.P., Sequoia Technology Partners XII, L.P., Ajay V. Vashee, Margaret C. Whitman. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Bryan Pikal Notice of Publication of Securities Class Action Notice (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/8/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Please Resubmit Proposed Summons Listing all defendants on One Summons. [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Bryan Pikal. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. SEC Class Action Notice due by 10/25/2019. Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Correction of clerical error on category. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/7/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/21/2019. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bryan Pikal re #1 Complaint,,, (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 ***REFILED AT DKT. #9 ***Proposed Summons. (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 10/4/2019) Modified on 10/15/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (with jury demand) (no process) against Allen & Company LLC, Donald W. Blair, Canaccord Genuity LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Dropbox, Inc., Arash Ferdowsi, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Andrew W. Houston, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Paul E. Jacobs, Jefferies LLC, KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Robert J. Mylod, Jr., Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Timothy J. Regan, Condoleezza Rice, SC XII Management, LLC, R. Bryan Schreier, Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC, Sequoia Capital XII, L.P., Sequoia Technology Partners XII, L.P., Ajay V. Vashee, Margaret C. Whitman ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13766430.). Filed byBryan Pikal. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 10/4/2019) Modified on 10/8/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pikal v. Dropbox, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bryan Schreier
Represented By: Nina F. Locker
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Evan L Seite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies LLC
Represented By: Matthew W Close
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KeyBanc Capital Markets Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W Close
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W Close
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Matthew W Close
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew W. Houston
Represented By: Nina F. Locker
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Evan L Seite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Technology Partners XII, L.P.
Represented By: Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr.
Represented By: Shuang Zhang
Represented By: Linda Jane Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dropbox, Inc.
Represented By: Nina F. Locker
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Evan L Seite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arash Ferdowsi
Represented By: Nina F. Locker
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Evan L Seite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen & Company LLC
Represented By: Matthew W Close
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMP Securities LLC
Represented By: Matthew W Close
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret C. Whitman
Represented By: Nina F. Locker
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Evan L Seite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co.
Represented By: Matthew W Close
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Condoleezza Rice
Represented By: Nina F. Locker
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Evan L Seite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald W. Blair
Represented By: Nina F. Locker
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Evan L Seite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajay V. Vashee
Represented By: Nina F. Locker
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Evan L Seite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Represented By: Matthew W Close
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Mylod, Jr.
Represented By: Nina F. Locker
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Evan L Seite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Regan
Represented By: Nina F. Locker
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Evan L Seite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital XII, L.P.
Represented By: Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr.
Represented By: Shuang Zhang
Represented By: Linda Jane Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital XII Principals Fund, LLC
Represented By: Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr.
Represented By: Shuang Zhang
Represented By: Linda Jane Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E. Jacobs
Represented By: Nina F. Locker
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Evan L Seite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W Close
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canaccord Genuity LLC
Represented By: Matthew W Close
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Matthew W Close
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC XII Management, LLC
Represented By: Harry Arthur Olivar, Jr.
Represented By: Shuang Zhang
Represented By: Linda Jane Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Matthew W Close
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Pikal
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?