Agaton-Hernandez v. Diaz et al
Plaintiff: Francisco Agaton-Hernandez
Defendant: Craig Koenig, Ralph Diaz and Kathleen Allison
Case Number: 5:2019cv06756
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lucy H Koh
Referring Judge: PSLC MBI
2 Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings RE 57 Order Relating Case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RELATING CASE; GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; DISMISSING CASE WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; DENYING EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on November 20, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2019: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kedS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO DETERMINE WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED re case 19-cv-6756-YGR (PR) and 19-cv-1928-LHK (PR). Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Francisco Agaton-Hernandez. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 EX PARTE EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Francisco Agaton-Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against Kathleen Allison, Ralph Diaz, Craig Koenig. Filed byFrancisco Agaton-Hernandez. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2019: #1 Envelope) (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agaton-Hernandez v. Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Agaton-Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?