Kimner v. Web Watchers et al
Plaintiff: Audrey L. Kimner
Defendant: Esq. Suzanne Groff, Esq. J. Todd Manley, Susan Kimner, Thomas Kimner, Esq. Alex Cash, Esq. Lori D. Stoney, Web Watchers, Mike Osborn, Esq. Paul Tinkler, Ron Penna, Esq. Jerry Theos, Michael J. Kimner and Esq. Margaret Theos
Case Number: 5:2019cv06973
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byAudrey L. Kimner. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byAudrey L. Kimner. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Re: Plaintiff's Letter. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/27/2019. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kedS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Audrey Kimner. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Audrey Kimner. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Audrey Kimner. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for February 19, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019) (kedS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kedS, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case,. Reassignment Order signed by ge Clerk on 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2019: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2019: #3 Amended Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Audrey L. Kimner. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; SCREENING COMPLAINT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915; GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff Kimner may file an amended complaint by 12/13/2019. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/12/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Audrey L. Kimner. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex Cash, Suzanne Groff, Michael J. Kimner, Susan Kimner, Thomas Kimner, J. Todd Manley, Mike Osborn, Ron Penna, Lori D. Stoney, Jerry Theos, Margaret Theos, Paul Tinkler, Web Watchers. Filed byAudrey L. Kimner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimner v. Web Watchers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Suzanne Groff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. J. Todd Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Kimner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Kimner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Alex Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Lori D. Stoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Web Watchers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Paul Tinkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Penna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Jerry Theos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Kimner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Margaret Theos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey L. Kimner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?