Dela Cruz et al v. Quality Loan Service Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Evelyn Dela Cruz and Efren Dela Cruz
Defendant: Thomas J. Holthus, HSBC Mortgage Corporation, Pedro Pagola, California Reconveyance Company, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., All Persons Unknown Claiming any Legal or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiff's Title, Thereto, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Bank of America, National Association, Washington Mutual Bank, FSB, James Dimon, U.S. Bank, National Association and Ronald Alonzo
Case Number: 5:2019cv07077
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Efren Dela Cruz, Evelyn Dela Cruz (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #10 Motion to Dismiss and #14 Motion to Dismiss With Leave to Amend. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kedS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss ) / Notice of Non-Opposition filed byCalifornia Reconveyance Company, James Dimon, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Washington Mutual Bank, FSB. (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent SPS Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA) Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Group AG for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.; Corporate Parent US Bancorp for U.S. Bank, National Association. (Hawkins, Bryan) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, National Association. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 11/20/2019. Replies due by 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order)(Hawkins, Bryan) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Edward Addiego, III (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Reconveyance Company, James Dimon, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Washington Mutual Bank, FSB re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Certificate of Service (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Judicial Notice re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed byCalifornia Reconveyance Company, James Dimon, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Washington Mutual Bank, FSB. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by California Reconveyance Company, James Dimon, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Washington Mutual Bank, FSB. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 11/18/2019. Replies due by 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by California Reconveyance Company, James Dimon, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Washington Mutual Bank, FSB (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Reconveyance Company, James Dimon, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Washington Mutual Bank, FSB re #1 Notice of Removal, (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for Wednesday, February 19, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due February 12, 2020. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Reconveyance Company, James Dimon, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Washington Mutual Bank, FSB.. (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/13/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 19CV353114. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13832371). Filed byJP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Washington Mutual Bank, FSB, California Reconveyance Company, James Dimon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Khoury, Monder) (Filed on 10/28/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dela Cruz et al v. Quality Loan Service Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Dela Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efren Dela Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Holthus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Pagola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Represented By: Monder Khoury
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Monder Khoury
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Lakeith Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Unknown Claiming any Legal or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint Adverse to Plaintiff's Title, Thereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank, FSB
Represented By: Monder Khoury
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dimon
Represented By: Monder Khoury
Represented By: Joseph Edward Addiego, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Bryan Lakeith Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Alonzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?