Luttrell v. Hart et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Luttrell
Defendant: Santa Cruz County, James Hart and Victor Mora
Case Number: 5:2019cv07300
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/23/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by James Hart. (Murphy, Aerin) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 11, 2019 ***CORRECTION***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF #17 Order: Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019) Modified text on 12/12/2019 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER approving Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; and Deadlines And Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/11/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; ADR DEADLINES AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by James Hart, Victor Mora, Santa Cruz County. (Murphy, Aerin) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed James Hart served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Victor Mora served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019; Santa Cruz County served on 11/22/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed Clerk on 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tyler Luttrell.. (Caballero, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Victor Mora. (Attachments: #1 USMS 285)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Tyler Luttrell (Caballero, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk's Office to Plaintiff's Attorney requesting address to serve defendant Victor Mora per ECF #7 Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; Screening Complaint and Service. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to James Hart, Santa Cruz County only. (Attachments: #1 Hart USMS 285, #2 County USMS 285)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; SCREENING COMPLAINT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915. Re: Dkt. Nos. #1 , #2 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/22/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/20/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Caballero, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tyler Luttrell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Caballero, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Hart, Victor Mora, Santa Cruz County. Filed byTyler Luttrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Caballero, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/6/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luttrell v. Hart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Luttrell
Represented By: Jonathan Che Gettleman
Represented By: Elizabeth McGill Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Cruz County
Represented By: Aerin Colleen Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Hart
Represented By: Aerin Colleen Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Mora
Represented By: Aerin Colleen Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?