Lovoi v. Hastings et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Joseph Lovoi
Defendant: Ann Mather, Spencer Neumann, Richard N. Barton, Bradford L. Smith, Timothy M. Haley, Jay C. Hoag, Mathias Dopfner, Netflix, Inc., Rodolphe Belmer, Susan Rice, Reed Hastings, Anne M. Sweeney and Leslie Kilgore
Case Number: 5:2019cv07303
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for March 25, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings re #16 Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Edward J. Davila no longer assigned to case, (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 30, 2019. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gerald Joseph Lovoi. Service waived by All Defendants. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gerald Joseph Lovoi.. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard N. Barton, Rodolphe Belmer, Mathias Dopfner, Timothy M. Haley, Reed Hastings, Jay C. Hoag, Leslie Kilgore, Ann Mather, Netflix, Inc., Spencer Neumann, Susan Rice, Bradford L. Smith, Anne M. Sweeney.. (Eggleton, Keith) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard N. Barton, Rodolphe Belmer, Mathias Dopfner, Timothy M. Haley, Reed Hastings, Jay C. Hoag, Leslie Kilgore, Ann Mather, Netflix, Inc., Spencer Neumann, Susan Rice, Bradford L. Smith, Anne M. Sweeney (Eggleton, Keith) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Richard N. Barton, Rodolphe Belmer, Mathias Dopfner, Timothy M. Haley, Reed Hastings, Jay C. Hoag, Leslie Kilgore, Ann Mather, Netflix, Inc., Spencer Neumann, Susan Rice, Bradford L. Smith, Anne M. Sweeney (Eggleton, Keith) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E. Eggleton , Rodney G. Strickland, and Sean P. Killeen (Eggleton, Keith) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Gerald Joseph Lovoi shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Richard N. Barton, Rodolphe Belmer, Mathias Dopfner, Timothy M. Haley, Reed Hastings, Jay C. Hoag, Leslie Kilgore, Ann Mather, Netflix, Inc., Spencer Neumann, Susan Rice, Bradford L. Smith, Anne M. Sweeney. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/20/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13862594.). Filed byGerald Joseph Lovoi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Verification, #2 Exhibit F.R.C.P. 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit Certification of Interested Entities or Persons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Evan) (Filed on 11/6/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovoi v. Hastings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Mather
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Neumann
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard N. Barton
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Sean P. Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradford L. Smith
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy M. Haley
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay C. Hoag
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathias Dopfner
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Sean P. Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodolphe Belmer
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Sean P. Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Rice
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Represented By: Rodney Grant Strickland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne M. Sweeney
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Kilgore
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Joseph Lovoi
Represented By: Evan Jason Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?