Robert Troy Cortez v. Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA
Plaintiff: Robert T Cortez
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2019cv07476
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert T Cortez.. (Sussman, Rachel) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Jeong, In Seon) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/31/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 Attny Gen USMS 285, #2 SSA USMS 285, #3 US Attny USMS 285)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Sussman, Rachel) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 #Electronic filing error.*SECOND NOTICE* Incorrect event used. [err101] Re-File as Proposed SummonsThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file i n its entirety. Re: #6 Affidavit of Service filed by Robert T Cortez (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
November 27, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]*Proposed Summons must be Filed as Proposed Summons under Other Documents*This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #6 Affidavit of Service filed by Robert T Cortez (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proposed Summons for Clerk to Issue re Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma pauperis proposed, filed by Robert T Cortez. (Sussman, Rachel) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 22, 2019 #Electronic filing error.*SECOND NOTICE* Attorney must file a Proposed Summons for Clerk to Issue Re: #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (sfbS, C OURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 19, 2019 #Electronic filing error.*Attorney must file a Proposed Summons for clerk to issue* Re: #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Screening Complaint and O rdering Service. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; SCREENING COMPLAINT AND ORDERING SERVICE. Re: Dkt. No. #2 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/29/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert T Cortez. (Sussman, Rachel) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byRobert T Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sussman, Rachel) (Filed on 11/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Troy Cortez v. Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: In Seon Jeong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert T Cortez
Represented By: Rachel Sue Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?