Moore et al v. Hastings et al
Plaintiff: Dion Williams Moore and David Stein
Defendant: Ann Mather, Reed Hastings, Mathias Dopfner, Jay Hoag, Timothy Haley, Netflix, Inc., Rodolphe Belmer, Susan Rice, Anne Sweeney, Richard Barton, Leslie Kilgore and Bradford Smith
Case Number: 5:2019cv07748
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Change of Address by Evan Jason Smith (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #21 Stipulation.(lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Related Derivative Actions and Requesting Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Co-Lead Counsel filed by Dion Williams Moore, David Stein. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 20 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for March 25, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings re #17 Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on December 30, 2019. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by David Stein, Dion Williams Moore. Service waived by All Defendants. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard Barton, Rodolphe Belmer, Mathias Dopfner, Timothy Haley, Reed Hastings, Jay Hoag, Leslie Kilgore, Ann Mather, Netflix, Inc., Susan Rice, Bradford Smith, Anne Sweeney (Eggleton, Keith) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Richard Barton, Rodolphe Belmer, Mathias Dopfner, Timothy Haley, Reed Hastings, Jay Hoag, Leslie Kilgore, Ann Mather, Netflix, Inc., Susan Rice, Bradford Smith, Anne Sweeney (Eggleton, Keith) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E. Eggleton , Rodney G. Strickland, and Sean P. Killeen (Eggleton, Keith) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an in-person Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 2/20/2020. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. If either party so desires, however, counsel may file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am, in which case the Conference will be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically for all parties, and all parties must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins no longer assigned to the case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2019 Filing 11 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dion Williams Moore, David Stein.. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due 2/19/2019. The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Nathanael Cousins: http://cand.uscourts.gov/nc. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/11/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case, (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 11/27/2019. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Richard Barton, Rodolphe Belmer, Mathias Dopfner, Timothy Haley, Reed Hastings, Jay Hoag, Leslie Kilgore, Ann Mather, Netflix, Inc., Susan Rice, Bradford Smith, Anne Sweeney. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/10/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Smith, Evan) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13923960.). Filed byDavid Stein, Dion Williams Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Verification - Moore, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff Verification Stein, #3 Exhibit FRCP 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #4 Exhibit Cert of Interested Entities, #5 Civil Cover Sheet + Addendum)(Smith, Evan) (Filed on 11/25/2019) Modified text on 11/26/2019 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Hastings et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Mather
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathias Dopfner
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Hoag
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Haley
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodolphe Belmer
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Rice
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Sweeney
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Barton
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Kilgore
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradford Smith
Represented By: Keith E. Eggleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dion Williams Moore
Represented By: Evan Jason Smith
Represented By: Ryan Paul Cardona
Represented By: Justin Kuehn
Represented By: Fletcher W. Moore
Represented By: Gregory M. Egleston
Represented By: Thomas J. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stein
Represented By: Evan Jason Smith
Represented By: Ryan Paul Cardona
Represented By: Justin Kuehn
Represented By: Fletcher W. Moore
Represented By: Gregory M. Egleston
Represented By: Thomas J. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?