Hong v. ByteDance, Inc., a corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Misty Hong
Defendant: TikTok, Inc., a corporation, Musical.ly, a corporation, Beijing ByteDance Technology Co. Ltd., a privately-held company and ByteDance, Inc., a corporation,
Case Number: 5:2019cv07792
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Extend Time for All Defendants to Respond to the Complaint filed by Beijing ByteDance Technology Co. Ltd., a privately-held company, ByteDance, Inc., a corporation,, Musical.ly, a corporation, TikTok, Inc., a corporation. (Weibell, Anthony) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Misty Hong (Rotter, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Misty Hong. ByteDance, Inc., a corporation, served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Rotter, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Misty Hong. TikTok, Inc., a corporation served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Rotter, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for March 4, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed Clerk on 12/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Misty Hong.. (Rotter, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc E. Masters Noticing the Appearance of Thomas R. Freeman (Masters, Marc) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc E. Masters (Masters, Marc) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ekwan Eric Rhow (Rhow, Ekwan) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Lawrence Godino (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Beijing ByteDance Technology Co. Ltd. a privately-held company, ByteDance, Inc. a corporation, Musical.ly a corporation, TikTok, Inc. a corporation. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/11/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Rotter, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beijing ByteDance Technology Co. Ltd., a privately-held company, ByteDance, Inc., a corporation,, Musical.ly, a corporation, TikTok, Inc., a corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13932112.). Filed byMisty Hong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rotter, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/27/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hong v. ByteDance, Inc., a corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TikTok, Inc., a corporation
Represented By: Anthony J Weibell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Musical.ly, a corporation
Represented By: Anthony J Weibell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beijing ByteDance Technology Co. Ltd., a privately-held company
Represented By: Anthony J Weibell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ByteDance, Inc., a corporation,
Represented By: Anthony J Weibell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Hong
Represented By: Jonathan Moshe Rotter
Represented By: Marc E. Masters
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Represented By: Ekwan Eric Rhow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?