Johnson v. Halle Properties, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: DOES 1-10,, Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. and Halle Properties, L.L.C.
Case Number: 5:2019cv08073
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint // Stipulation for Extension to File Answer on or before March 6, 2020 filed by Halle Properties, L.L.C., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc.. (Williams, Matthew) (Filed on 2/5/2020) Modified on 2/6/2020 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Melissa Kooistra Eaves (Eaves, Melissa) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension to File Answer on or before February 5, 2020 filed by Halle Properties, L.L.C., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc.. (Williams, Matthew) (Filed on 1/6/2020) Modified on 1/8/2020 (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by Halle Properties, L.L.C., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc.. (Eaves, Melissa) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Halle Properties, L.L.C. served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Halle Properties, L.L.C., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc.. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/26/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13968165.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 12/11/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Halle Properties, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Kooistra Eaves
Represented By: Matthew Allender Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halle Properties, L.L.C.
Represented By: Melissa Kooistra Eaves
Represented By: Matthew Allender Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?