Xiaohua Huang v. First Republic Bank
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Defendant: First Republic Bank
Case Number: 5:2019cv08161
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Xiaohua Huang (Huang, Xiaohua) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re: #14 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/3/2020. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Xiaohua Huang. Responses due by 2/18/2020. Replies due by 2/25/2020. (Huang, Xiaohua) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/4/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #8 Amended Complaint TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by First Republic Bank. (Sacksteder, Michael) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Lyle Larson (Larson, Christopher) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Sacksteder (Sacksteder, Michael) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Xiaohua Huang shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/16/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 1, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against First Republic Bank. Filed byXiaohua Huang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Huang, Xiaohua) (Filed on 1/1/2020)
January 1, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Xiaohua Huang. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Huang, Xiaohua) (Filed on 1/1/2020)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xiaohua Huang. First Republic Bank served on 12/17/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/18/2019. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Xiaohua Huang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to First Republic Bank. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Republic Bank (Filing fee $ 400.). Filed byXiaohua Huang. Consent/Declination due by 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Filing Fee Receipt # 54611018316) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xiaohua Huang v. First Republic Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Republic Bank
Represented By: Michael John Sacksteder
Represented By: Christopher Lyle Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?