Guardant Health, Inc. v. Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Guardant Health, Inc.
Defendant: Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc.
Respondent: Vernon A. Norviel and Wilson Sonsini Goodrich Rosati, LLP
Case Number: 5:2019mc80131
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE ON MOTION TO COMPEL. Motion Hearing re: #1 is hereby reset for 7/18/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/13/19.(dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing Date on Motion to Compel filed by Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc.. (Kahf, Baraa) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Motion hearing re: #1 MOTION to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to (dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY (re #1 MOTION to Compel ) filed byPersonal Genome Diagnostics, Inc.. (Kahf, Baraa) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #1 MOTION to Compel Respondents Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati and Vern Norviel's Opposition to Personal Genome Diagnostics' Motion to Compel Third-Party Production by Vernon A. Norviel, Wilson Sonsini Goodrich Rosati, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liss, Luke) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Anthony Liss (Liss, Luke) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Order re #1 MOTION to Compel by Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration in Support of #1 MOTION to Compel filed byPersonal Genome Diagnostics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #1 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel filed by Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc.. Responses due by 5/28/2019. Replies due by 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 receipt)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guardant Health, Inc. v. Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guardant Health, Inc.
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Personal Genome Diagnostics, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vernon A. Norviel
Represented By: Mark Gregory Parnes
Represented By: Luke Anthony Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wilson Sonsini Goodrich Rosati, LLP
Represented By: Mark Gregory Parnes
Represented By: Luke Anthony Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?