New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC v. City of Los Altos
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC and New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as AT&T Mobility
Defendant: City of Los Altos
Petitioner: GTE Mobilnet of California Limited Partnership
Case Number: 5:2020cv00294
Filed: January 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Proposed Order re #18 Opposition/Response to Motion to Relate Cases by City of Los Altos. (Fox, Deborah) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Relate Case No. 5:20-cv-00386 SVK ) filed byCity of Los Altos. (Fox, Deborah) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCity of Los Altos. (Fox, Deborah) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Relate Case No. 5:20-cv-00386 SVK filed by GTE Mobilnet of California Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heard, James) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by City of Los Altos. (Fox, Deborah) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. City of Los Altos served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020. (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #9 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Hanse Germann, Counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/16/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 1/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Hans Germann ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14068249.) Filing fee previously paid on 01/14/2020 filed by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Germann, Hans) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC.. (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to City of Los Altos. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent New Cingular Wireless Services, Inc., Corporate Parent SBC Long Distance, LLC, Corporate Parent BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc., Corporate Parent AT&T Mobility LLC., Corporate Parent AT&T Inc, Corporate Parent SBC Tower Holdings LLC for New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elspeth Victoria Hansen for Plaintiff AT&T Mobility (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injuctive Relief and Request for Expedited Review Pursuant to 47 U.S.C. 332(c)(7)(B)(v) against City of Los Altos ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14066314.). Filed byNew Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansen, Elspeth) (Filed on 1/13/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC v. City of Los Altos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Altos
Represented By: Deborah J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC
Represented By: Elspeth Victoria Hansen
Represented By: Raymond Paul Bolanos
Represented By: Hans Joseph Germann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Cingular Wireless PCS, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as AT&T Mobility
Represented By: Elspeth Victoria Hansen
Represented By: Raymond Paul Bolanos
Represented By: Hans Joseph Germann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GTE Mobilnet of California Limited Partnership
Represented By: James A. Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?