Wang v. Ehang Holdings Limited et al
Plaintiff: Gary Wang
Defendant: GUANGZHOU EHANG INTELLIGENT TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD., RICHARD JIAN LIU, HUAZHI HU, SHANG-WEN HSIAO, EHANG HOLDINGS LIMITED and DERRICK YIFANG XIONG
Case Number: 5:2020cv00569
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ehang Holdings Limited, Guangzhou Ehang Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd., Shang-Wen Hsiao, Huazhi Hu, Richard Jian Liu, Derrick Yifang Xiong. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 4/8/2020. Replies due by 4/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(Ryan, Bing) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Wang. Ehang Holdings Limited served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020; Guangzhou Ehang Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd. served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020; Shang-Wen Hsiao served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020; Huazhi Hu served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020; Richard Jian Liu served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020; Derrick Yifang Xiong served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (Li, J.) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANTS BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/26/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Re: Permission to Effect Service of Process on Defendants by Alternative Means filed by Gary Wang. Responses due by 2/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Wang Decl ISO Mtn, #2 Declaration Li Decl ISO Mtn, #3 Proposed Order)(Li, J.) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Robert Peterson (Peterson, Daniel) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ehang Holdings Limited, Guangzhou Ehang Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd., Shang-Wen Hsiao, Huazhi Hu, Richard Jian Liu, Derrick Yifang Xiong. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Gary Wang (Li, J.) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Li, J.) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gary Wang.. (Li, J.) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EHANG HOLDINGS LIMITED, GUANGZHOU EHANG INTELLIGENT TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD., SHANG-WEN HSIAO, HUAZHI HU, RICHARD JIAN LIU, DERRICK YIFANG XIONG ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14105847.). Filed byGary Wang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Li, J.) (Filed on 1/24/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. Ehang Holdings Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUANGZHOU EHANG INTELLIGENT TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD JIAN LIU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUAZHI HU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANG-WEN HSIAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EHANG HOLDINGS LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DERRICK YIFANG XIONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Wang
Represented By: J. James Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?