Hedgepath v. Madden
Plaintiff: Hasson Hedgepath
Defendant: Madden, R
Case Number: 5:2020cv00858
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lucy H Koh
Referring Judge: PSLC MBI
2 Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 4/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REASSIGN CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/24/20. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hasson Hedgepath. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Hasson Hedgpath. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byHasson Hedgepath. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 3/16/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Petition on Form due by 3/16/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020) Modified on 2/6/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 Letter from Hasson Hedgepath. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/6/2020: #1 Envelope) (ajsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/6/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hedgepath v. Madden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hasson Hedgepath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madden, R
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?