Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP v. Ladonna Butler et al
Plaintiff: Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP
Defendant: Ladonna Butler, Internal Revenue Service and Sunnova Energy Corporation
Case Number: 5:2020cv00899
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer #8 . The United States has until 5/8/2020 to file an answer. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration of Lawrence D. Harris in Support of #10 Clerk's Declination of Default filed byBarrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Harris, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT as to LADONNA BUTLER.No declaration that defendant is not a minor, incompetent, or in United States military service. Fed R.Civ.P 55(b)(1). (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SUNNOVA ENERGY CORPORATION. (Related documents(s) #7 , #6 )(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stevko, Alexander) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lawrence D. Harris in Support of Request to Enter Defaults)(Harris, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lawrence D. Harris in Support of Request to Enter Defaults)(Harris, Lawrence) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP Proof of Service (Harris, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP.. (Harris, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/24/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is C19-02609. (). Filed byInternal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevko, Alexander) (Filed on 2/6/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP v. Ladonna Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP
Represented By: Lawrence Daniel Harris
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladonna Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Alexander Stevko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunnova Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?