Community Hospital of The Monterey Peninsula v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Community Hospital of The Monterey Peninsula
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv00917
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byAetna Life Insurance Company. (Kleiner, Matthew) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Aetna Life Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, Confirming Notification to State Court of Removal (Kleiner, Matthew) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Kleiner, Matthew) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Community Hospital of The Monterey Peninsula. (Leitzinger, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Community Hospital of The Monterey Peninsula.. (Leitzinger, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aetna Life Insurance Company.. (Kleiner, Matthew) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION to Extend Defendant's Deadline to File Response to the Complaint (extended to 3/13/2020) #4 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kleiner, Matthew) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/21/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Monterey. Their case number is 19cv004734. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14152065). Filed byAetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of All Purpose Case Assignment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Declaration of Adinolfi, #7 Declaration of Kleiner, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kleiner, Matthew) (Filed on 2/6/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Community Hospital of The Monterey Peninsula v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Gregory Kleiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Hospital of The Monterey Peninsula
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Leitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?