Molander v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: Brandon Molander
Defendant: Google LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00918
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION To Extend Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Google LLC. (Fahringer, Susan) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan D. Fahringer (Fahringer, Susan) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon Molander. Google LLC served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020. (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #12 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for John Christopher Carey, Counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/21/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #13 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer Marie Hernandez, Counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/21/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 16 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila and Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14199792.) filed by Brandon Molander. (Hernandez, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by John Christopher Carey ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14199583.) filed by Brandon Molander. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Carey, John) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brandon Molander.. (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Corrected Motion for Pro Hac Vice; terminating #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/12/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice CORRECTION OF DOCKET #8 replace #8 with #9 ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14169564.) Filing fee previously paid on 02-12-2020 filed by Brandon Molander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Milian, David) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 *** ERROR *** please see #9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14169564.) filed by Brandon Molander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Milian, David) (Filed on 2/12/2020) Modified on 2/13/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David Philip Milian Counsel for Plaintiff (Milian, David) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/21/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Brandon Molander (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14152283.). Filed byBrandon Molander. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 2/6/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molander v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Molander
Represented By: Tina Wolfson
Represented By: John Christopher Carey
Represented By: David Philip Milian
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Susan D. Fahringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?