Nguyen et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Tuan Vo and Truc Nguyen
Defendant: John Kramar, Acting Director Kenneth Thomas Cuccinelli, Jim Wyrough, William P. Barr and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 5:2020cv00976
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Truc Nguyen, Tuan Vo.. (Luu, Nguyen) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/9/2020. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Kenneth Thomas Cuccinelli, John Kramar, Chad F. Wolf, Jim Wyrough, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/24/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Luu, Nguyen) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief and For Writ of Mandamus against William P. Barr, Kenneth Thomas Cuccinelli, John Kramar, Chad F. Wolf, Jim Wyrough ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14156658.). Filed byTruc Nguyen, Tuan Vo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Table of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-I)(Luu, Nguyen) (Filed on 2/7/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tuan Vo
Represented By: Nguyen Dinh Luu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truc Nguyen
Represented By: Nguyen Dinh Luu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kramar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth Thomas Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Wyrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?