Tang v. Kramar
Plaintiff: Tammy Xuan Tang
Defendant: John Kramar
Case Number: 5:2020cv01741
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 Refund Status re #7 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14267941 by Tammy Xuan Tang. (Luu, Nguyen) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tammy Xuan Tang re #2 Amended Petition corrected certificate (Luu, Nguyen) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 EXHIBITS re #2 Amended Petition exhibit with translation filed byTammy Xuan Tang. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Luu, Nguyen) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/25/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED PETITION corrected petition against John Kramar. Filed byTammy Xuan Tang. (Luu, Nguyen) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 11, 2020 ***DISREGARD*** INCORRECTLY FILED CASE
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION to amend naturalization certificate against John Kramar (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14267941). Filed byTammy Xuan Tang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Luu, Nguyen) (Filed on 3/11/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tang v. Kramar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Xuan Tang
Represented By: Nguyen Dinh Luu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kramar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?