Nelson et al v. See-Grins, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Nelson and Mark Nelson
Defendant: See-Grins, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv01969
Filed: March 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jacqueline Nelson, Mark Nelson.. (Baker, Terry) (Filed on 4/4/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by See-Grins, Inc... (Gonzales, Dolores) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand bySee-Grins, Inc.. (Gonzales, Dolores) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/3/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by See-Grins, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Gonzales, Dolores) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monterey Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV000630. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14300432). Filed bySee-Grins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs' State Court Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Plaintiffs' State Court Action Summons, #3 Exhibit C: Notice of Removal to State Court, #4 Exhibit D: Notice of Removal to Plaintiff, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Gonzales, Dolores) (Filed on 3/20/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson et al v. See-Grins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: See-Grins, Inc.
Represented By: Dolores E. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Nelson
Represented By: Terry L. Baker
Represented By: Jon Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Nelson
Represented By: Terry L. Baker
Represented By: Jon Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?