Thompson v. U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, successor in interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee as successor by merger to Lasalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for WaMu et al
Plaintiff: Debbie Alice Thompson
Defendant: Colleen Irby, California Reconveyance Company, McCarthy & Holthus, LLP, Quality Loan Service Corporation and U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, successor in interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee as successor by merger to Lasalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for WaMu
Case Number: 5:2020cv02107
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byCalifornia Reconveyance Company, Colleen Irby. (Henderson, Matthew) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY (re #30 MOTION to Remand ) filed byDebbie Alice Thompson. (Marshall, Charles) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 35 OBJECTIONS to re #12 Request for Judicial Notice by Debbie Alice Thompson. (Marshall, Charles) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 34 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byDebbie Alice Thompson. (Marshall, Charles) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 33 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #30 MOTION to Remand ) filed byCalifornia Reconveyance Company, Colleen Irby. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Matthew Henderson in Support of Opposition of Defendants California Reconveyance Company and Colleen Irby to Motion to Remand)(Henderson, Matthew) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order Granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/29/2020. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 31 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Motion #11 to Dismiss Complaint and Joinders #14 and #26 , and #30 Motion to Remand Hearing set for 6/18/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. The Motion briefing schedule remains unchanged. See Civil L.R. 7-7(d). Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Remand filed by Debbie Alice Thompson. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 5/11/2020. Replies due by 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marshall, Charles) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila. Judge Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi assigned as referral judge. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Judge Susan Y. Soong on April 27, 2020. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by McCarthy & Holthus, LLP, Quality Loan Service Corporation re #27 MOTION to Dismiss (Starrett, Carl) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 27 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** first page missing - MOTION to Dismiss filed by McCarthy & Holthus, LLP, Quality Loan Service Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2020 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 5/11/2020. Replies due by 5/18/2020. (Starrett, Carl) (Filed on 4/27/2020) Modified on 4/27/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Judge name or initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/ini tials on future filings.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #28 Notice (Other) filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation, McCarthy & Holthus, LLP *** (CORRECT EVENT IS MOTION ***not notice (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]Judge name or initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/i nitials on future filings. Re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Quality Loan Service Corporation, McCarthy & Holthus, LLP (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER to #11 Motion to Dismiss, filed by McCarthy & Holthus, LLP, Quality Loan Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Starrett, Carl) (Filed on 4/23/2020) Modified on 4/24/2020. Incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2020 Filing 25 Declaration of Debbie Alice Thompson and Charles T. Marshall in Support of #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byDebbie Alice Thompson. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Marshall, Charles) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Debbie Alice Thompson.. (Marshall, Charles) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Debbie Alice Thompson.. (Marshall, Charles) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Interim Order re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Debbie Alice Thompson. Plaintiff's declaration due by 4/20/2020. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 4/17/2020. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Debbie Alice Thompson. (Marshall, Charles) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Thomas Marshall (Marshall, Charles) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #16 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2020: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Debbie Alice Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 Joinder re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, successor in interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee as successor by merger to Lasalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for WaMu. (Sarkis, Sunny) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, successor in interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee as successor by merger to Lasalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for WaMu.. (Sarkis, Sunny) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Judicial Notice re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed byCalifornia Reconveyance Company, Colleen Irby. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Henderson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by California Reconveyance Company, Colleen Irby. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 4/16/2020. Replies due by 4/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henderson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by California Reconveyance Company, Colleen Irby Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines (Henderson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Reconveyance Company, Colleen Irby.. (Henderson, Matthew) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Andrew Woods (Woods, Thomas) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, successor in interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee as successor by merger to Lasalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for WaMu identifying Corporate Parent US Bank NA for U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, successor in interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee as successor by merger to Lasalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for WaMu. (Sarkis, Sunny) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sunny S. Sarkis (Sarkis, Sunny) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/10/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by California Reconveyance Company, Colleen Irby (Henderson, Matthew) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Notice of Removal of State Court Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1332(a), 1441(a), and (b) filed byCalifornia Reconveyance Company, Colleen Irby. (Henderson, Matthew) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV36344. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14317575). Filed byCalifornia Reconveyance Company, Colleen Irby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Quality's Declaration of Nonmonetary Status, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Henderson, Matthew) (Filed on 3/26/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, successor in interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee as successor by merger to Lasalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for WaMu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Irby
Represented By: Matthew S. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Represented By: Matthew S. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarthy & Holthus, LLP
Represented By: Carl H. Starrett, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Carl H. Starrett, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, successor in interest to Bank of America, National Association, as Trustee as successor by merger to Lasalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for WaMu
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Represented By: Sunny S. Sarkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Alice Thompson
Represented By: Charles Thomas Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?