RJ v. Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: RJ
Defendant: Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc. and VIANT, INC.
Case Number: 5:2020cv02255
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 29 Related Case Order. Signed by Edward J. Davila on May 18, 2020. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Dmitriy G Tishyevich (Tishyevich, Dmitriy) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #25 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Warren Haskel, Counsel for Defendant Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/11/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #24 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Joshua B. Simon, Counsel for Defendant Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/11/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14457147.) filed by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Haskel, Warren) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14457123.) filed by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Simon, Joshua) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RJ. Viant, Inc. served on 4/15/2020, answer due 5/6/2020. (Lavin, Matthew) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/30/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Donovan, William) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 20 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RJ. Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc. served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Lavin, Matthew) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to Case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Viant, Inc... (Arvidson, Carys) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Carys Anne Arvidson (Arvidson, Carys) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extension of Time to Respond filed by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Donovan, William) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Other Affiliate CIGNA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate CIGNA Corporation, Other Affiliate Cigna Holding Company for Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Donovan, William) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Other Affiliate CIGNA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate CIGNA Corporation, Other Affiliate Cigna Holding Company for Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.. (Donovan, William) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William Patrick Donovan, Jr (Donovan, William) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by RJ.. (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Lilienstein (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Joy Spielman (Spielman, Katie) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Matthew Lavin Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14372704.) filed by RJ. (Lavin, Matthew) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc., Viant, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Mitchell, Wendy) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/17/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc., VIANT, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14338427.). Filed byRJ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitchell, Wendy) (Filed on 4/2/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RJ v. Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.
Represented By: Warren Haskel
Represented By: Joshua B. Simon
Represented By: Dmitriy G Tishyevich
Represented By: William Patrick Donovan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIANT, INC.
Represented By: Carys Anne Arvidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RJ
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew M. Lavin
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?