Twitter, Inc. v. Voip-Pal.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Twitter, Inc.
Defendant: Voip-Pal.com, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv02397
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
2 Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order Regarding Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Briefing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 06/04/2020. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 25 Statement Regarding Consolidated Briefing by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Relating Cases; Order to File Joint Statement Regarding Consolidation. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 05/26/2020. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14429819.) filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Matthew, Thomas) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14424299.) filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lee, Gene) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES AND CORPORATE DISCLSOURE STATEMENT by Voip-Pal.com, Inc. (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 4/27/2020) Modified text on 4/28/2020 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lewis Emery Hudnell, III (Hudnell, Lewis) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 16 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for July 29, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due seven days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H, Koh for all further proceedings RE #14 ORDER Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Jeffrey S. White No Longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on April 21, 2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/21/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 04/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Twitter, Inc... (Fowler, Sarah) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE Re Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related by Twitter, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fowler, Sarah) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Twitter, Inc.. Voip-Pal.com, Inc. served on 4/10/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Fowler, Sarah) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Voip-Pal.com, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/23/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civ. L.R. 3-15 by Twitter, Inc. (Fowler, Sarah) (Filed on 4/8/2020) Modified on 4/9/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (Fowler, Sarah) (Filed on 4/8/2020) Modified on 4/9/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Fowler, Sarah) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Voip-Pal.com, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-14356436.). Filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fowler, Sarah) (Filed on 4/8/2020) Modified on 4/9/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twitter, Inc. v. Voip-Pal.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twitter, Inc.
Represented By: Amisha Kamlesh Manek
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Fowler
Represented By: Thomas V. matthew
Represented By: Gene W. Lee
Represented By: Thomas Vincent Matthew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voip-Pal.com, Inc.
Represented By: Lewis Emery Hudnell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?