Chrzanowski v. Adesto Technologies Corporation et al
Plaintiff: James Chrzanowski
Defendant: Susan Uthayakumar, Herve Fages, Narbeh Derhacobian, Kevin Palatnik, Francis Lee, Adesto Technologies Corporation and Nelson Chan
Case Number: 5:2020cv02684
Filed: April 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Chrzanowski (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge 5/12/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Adesto Technologies Corporation, Nelson Chan, Narbeh Derhacobian, Herve Fages, Francis Lee, Kevin Palatnik, Susan Uthayakumar. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 List of Defendants)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Proposed Summons should be filed using the correct event and not as an attachment or exhibit to any document. This f iling will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety as to Proposed Summons Only. Re:[1-2] Summons, filed by James Chrzanowski (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/1/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by James Chrzanowski re #1 Complaint, (Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adesto Technologies Corporation, Nelson Chan, Narbeh Derhacobian, Herve Fages, Francis Lee, Kevin Palatnik, Susan Uthayakumar ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14386527.). Filed byJames Chrzanowski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 List of Defendants)(Elkins, Joel) (Filed on 4/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chrzanowski v. Adesto Technologies Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Uthayakumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herve Fages
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narbeh Derhacobian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Palatnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adesto Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Chrzanowski
Represented By: Joel E. Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?