Greenbaum v. Zoom Video Communications, Inc
Plaintiff: Rachel Greenbaum
Defendant: Zoom Video Communications, Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv02861
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Rachel Greenbaum (McCauley, Kathryn) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 16 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for July 22, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due seven days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings re Order Granting Stipulation. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RELATING CASE to 5:20-cv-02155-LHK. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on May 20, 2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan George Slovak for Defendant Zoom Video Communications, Inc. (Slovak, Evan) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Douglas Mornin for Defendant Zoom Video Communications, Inc. (Mornin, Joseph) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Charniece Pierre by Defendant Zoom Video Communications, Inc. (Pierre, Danielle) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen R. Hartnett for Defendant Zoom Video Communications, Inc. (Hartnett, Kathleen) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis LeBlanc for Defendant Zoom Video Communications, Inc. (LeBlanc, Travis) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Zoom Video Communications, Inc (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes for Defendant Zoom Video Communications, Inc. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Rachel Greenbaum. Service waived by Zoom Video Communications, Inc waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Zoom Video Communications, Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/11/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (McCauley, Kathryn) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zoom Video Communications, Inc ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14409592.). Filed byRachel Greenbaum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCauley, Kathryn) (Filed on 4/24/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenbaum v. Zoom Video Communications, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Greenbaum
Represented By: Kathryn Yvette McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoom Video Communications, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?