Taleshpour v. APPLE INC.
Plaintiff: Mahan Taleshpour
Defendant: APPLE INC.
Case Number: 5:2020cv03122
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by APPLE INC.. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/15/2020. Replies due by 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey LaBerge, #2 Declaration of David R. Singh, #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of David R. Singh)(Singh, David) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by APPLE INC. (Singh, David) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by APPLE INC.. (Singh, David) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ramraj Singh of Neeckaun Irani (Singh, David) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ramraj Singh of Audrey E. Stano (Singh, David) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ramraj Singh of Anne Cappella (Singh, David) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ramraj Singh (Singh, David) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mahan Taleshpour (Bickford, John) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings re #10 Order of Recusal] . Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2020: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/15/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mahan Taleshpour.. (Bickford, John) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to APPLE INC.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Bickford, John) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. A summons may only be issued to defendants named in a complaint. Garcia, Imperial and Aguilera are not named as defendants in the Complaint. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Mahan Taleshpour (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/28/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/20/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Bickford, John) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APPLE INC. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14443744.). Filed byMahan Taleshpour. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bickford, John) (Filed on 5/6/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taleshpour v. APPLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE INC.
Represented By: David Ramraj Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahan Taleshpour
Represented By: John Michael Bickford
Represented By: Alexander Russell Wheeler
Represented By: R. Rex Parris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?