Cedar Lane Technologies, Inc. v. Vivotek USA Inc.
Plaintiff: Cedar Lane Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Vivotek USA Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv03416
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
2 Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #15 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Isaac Rabicoff, Counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/16/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14700420.) filed by Cedar Lane Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 14 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 6/23/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cedar Lane Technologies, Inc... (Wagner, Lindsey) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cedar Lane Technologies, Inc.. Service waived by Vivotek USA Inc. waiver sent on 5/29/2020, answer due 7/28/2020. (Wagner, Lindsey) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 6/24/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 complaint)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Vivotek USA Inc. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Wagner, Lindsey) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Statement of Rule 7.1 Disclosure by Cedar Lane Technologies, Inc.. (Wagner, Lindsey) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/3/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Wagner, Lindsey) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vivotek USA Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14489203.). Filed byCedar Lane Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wagner, Lindsey) (Filed on 5/20/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cedar Lane Technologies, Inc. v. Vivotek USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivotek USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedar Lane Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsey Wagner
Represented By: Isaac P. Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?