Khan v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard A Khan
Defendant: Prestige Default Services, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC and DOES 1 through 10, Inclsuive
Case Number: 5:2020cv03608
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 24, 2020 Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to GRANT Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and DENY Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT. Re: Dkt. Nos. #6 , #12 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/24/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING RE: #6 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and #12 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand set for 7/22/2020, at 01:00 PM. The Court finds the motions suitable for hearing without oral argument. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY (re #12 MOTION to Remand ) filed byRichard A Khan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Khan, Richard) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 19 Request for Judicial Notice re #18 Opposition/Response to Motion filed bySpecialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Jones, Ryan) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Remand ) and Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed bySpecialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Jones, Ryan) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY (re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) to Plaintiff's Response filed bySpecialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Jones, Ryan) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard A Khan re #15 Opposition/Response to Motion (Khan, Richard) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byRichard A Khan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss)(Khan, Richard) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING HEARING RE: #12 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. The Court resets this motion to 7/22/2020, at 01:00 PM by telephone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard A Khan.. (Khan, Richard) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand filed by Richard A Khan. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2020 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 6/26/2020. Replies due by 7/6/2020. (Khan, Richard) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC re #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Proposed Order, #8 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Amended Proof of Service (McMahon, Tadeusz) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/12/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020) (Plaintiff notified via email)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Order re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (McMahon, Tadeusz) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC.. (McMahon, Tadeusz) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Judicial Notice re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed bySpecialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Related document(s) #6 ) (McMahon, Tadeusz) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2020 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 6/19/2020. Replies due by 6/26/2020. (McMahon, Tadeusz) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/12/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC . (McMahon, Tadeusz) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Judicial Notice re #1 Notice of Removal, filed bySpecialized Loan Servicing LLC. (Related document(s) #1 ) (McMahon, Tadeusz) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara. Their case number is 20CV365924. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14519545). Filed bySpecialized Loan Servicing LLC. (McMahon, Tadeusz) (Filed on 5/29/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Default Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Tadeusz McMahon
Represented By: Ryan David Jones
Represented By: Timothy Matthew Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, Inclsuive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?