Ramachandran v. Best Best & Krieger et al
Plaintiff: Satish Ramachandran
Defendant: Kirk Ballard, Christopher Diaz, Pamela Jacobs, Best Best & Krieger, a Limited Liability Partnership, Christina Hickey, David Kornfield, Christopher Jordan and Best Best & Krieger
Case Number: 5:2020cv03693
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn C. Curry Amended (Curry, Kathryn) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn C. Curry (Curry, Kathryn) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward David Marks (Marks, Edward) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 #34 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS KIRK BALLARD, DAVID KORNFIELD, AND CHRISTOPHER JORDAN TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/13/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS KIRK BALLARD, DAVID KORNFIELD, AND CHRISTOPHER JORDAN TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Kirk Ballard, Christopher Jordan, David Kornfield. (Demson, Ellen) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 33 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS KIRK BALLARD, DAVID KORNFIELD, AND CHRISTOPHER JORDAN TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Kirk Ballard, Christopher Jordan, David Kornfield. (Demson, Ellen) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 32 Certificate of Interested Entities by Christopher Jordan (Demson, Ellen) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by David Kornfield (Demson, Ellen) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 30 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kirk Ballard (Demson, Ellen) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Katherine Demson (Demson, Ellen) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Burns (Burns, Patrick) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimon Manolius (Manolius, Kimon) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha D. Wolff (Wolff, Samantha) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #24 CORRECTED STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT PAMELA JACOBS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND FOR PLAINTIFF SATISH RAMACHANDRAN TO FILE ANY OPPOSITION THERETO. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/30/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CORRECTED Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint and for Plaintiff to File Any Opposition Thereto filed by Pamela Jacobs. (Marks, Edward) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint and for Plaintiff Satish Ramachandran to File and Opposition Thereto filed by Pamela Jacobs. (Marks, Edward) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Satish Ramachandran. Service waived by Best Best & Krieger waiver sent on 6/12/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; Christopher Diaz waiver sent on 6/12/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; Christina Hickey waiver sent on 6/12/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Scott, John) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Satish Ramachandran. David Kornfield served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020. (Gearinger, Brian) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Satish Ramachandran. Christopher Jordan served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020. (Gearinger, Brian) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Satish Ramachandran. Pamela Jacobs served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020. (Gearinger, Brian) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Satish Ramachandran. Kirk Ballard served on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. (Gearinger, Brian) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Satish Ramachandran of Defendant David James Kornfield (Gearinger, Brian) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Satish Ramachandran of Defendant Christopher A. Jordan (Gearinger, Brian) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Satish Ramachandran of Defendant Pamela Jacobs (Gearinger, Brian) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Satish Ramachandran of Defendant Kirk Ballard (Gearinger, Brian) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety as Summons Returned Executed. Re: #16 Certificate of Service filed by Satish Ramacha ndran, #14 Certificate of Service filed by Satish Ramachandran, #15 Certificate of Service filed by Satish Ramachandran, #17 Certificate of Service filed by Satish Ramachandran (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT.Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by CLERK on 6/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Satish Ramachandran.. (Scott, John) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 Statement re #6 Order Plaintiff's Statement in Support of Relating Cases by Satish Ramachandran. (Scott, John) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kirk Ballard, Best Best & Krieger, Christopher Diaz, Christina Hickey, Pamela Jacobs, Christopher Jordan, David Kornfield. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Gearinger, Brian) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Interim Order re Referral to Determine Whether Cases are Related. Responses due by 7/9/2020. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 6/4/2020. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Satish Ramachandran . (Scott, John) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 5:20-cv-03693 NC and 5:18-cv-01223 VKD. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/3/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/17/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages (Filing fee of $400.00 paid. Receipt #0971-14536323) against All Defendants. Filed bySatish Ramachandran. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, John) (Filed on 6/3/2020) Modified on 6/3/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 06/17 used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a s eparate docket entry Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19 re: #1 . #1 Complaint. filed by Satish Ramachandran (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramachandran v. Best Best & Krieger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Ballard
Represented By: Samantha D. Wolff
Represented By: Patrick Burns
Represented By: Kimon Manolius
Represented By: Ellen Katherine Demson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Jacobs
Represented By: Kathryn C. Curry
Represented By: Edward David Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Best & Krieger, a Limited Liability Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kornfield
Represented By: Samantha D. Wolff
Represented By: Patrick Burns
Represented By: Kimon Manolius
Represented By: Ellen Katherine Demson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Jordan
Represented By: Samantha D. Wolff
Represented By: Patrick Burns
Represented By: Kimon Manolius
Represented By: Ellen Katherine Demson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Best & Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Satish Ramachandran
Represented By: John Houston Scott
Represented By: William Allan Cohan
Represented By: Brian Gearinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?