Bauer v. LinkedIn Corporation
Plaintiff: Adam Bauer
Defendant: LinkedIn Corporation
Case Number: 5:2020cv04599
Filed: July 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal under Federal Rule of Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Adam Bauer (Dunne, Brian) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Defendant LinkedIn Corporation's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by LinkedIn Corporation. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LinkedIn Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Microsoft Corporation for LinkedIn Corporation. (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Douglas Mornin for Defendant LinkedIn Corporation (Mornin, Joseph) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lilia Roady Lopez for Defendant LinkedIn Corporation (Lopez, Lilia) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany Christa Lobo for Defendant LinkedIn Corporation (Lobo, Bethany) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Dean Brown for Defendant LinkedIn Corporation (Brown, Matthew) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adam Bauer.. (Dunne, Brian) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adam Bauer. LinkedIn Corporation served on 7/14/2020, answer due 8/4/2020. (Bathaee, Yavar) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Yavar Bathaee (Bathaee, Yavar) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LinkedIn Corporation. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/24/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Dunne, Brian) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LinkedIn Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14677551.). Filed byAdam Bauer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunne, Brian) (Filed on 7/10/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauer v. LinkedIn Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LinkedIn Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Dean Brown
Represented By: Joseph Douglas Mornin
Represented By: Bethany Christa Lobo
Represented By: Lilia Roady Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Bauer
Represented By: Brian James Dunne
Represented By: Yavar Bathaee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?