Vance et al v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: Tim Janecyk and Steven Vance
Defendant: Google LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv04696
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER FINDING CASES NOT RELATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on August 19, 2020. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 25 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/10/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION #23 TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC TORESPOND TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/10/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Google LLC to Respond to Class Action Complaint filed by Google LLC. (Boundy, Mara) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Mara Boundy (Boundy, Mara) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Vance, Tim Janecyk. Google LLC served on 7/24/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Drury, Scott) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Nicholas R. Lange Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tim Janecyk, Steven Vance.. (Drury, Scott) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas R. Lange ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14715066.) filed by Tim Janecyk, Steven Vance. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lange, Nicholas) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Scott R. Drury representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Michael Kanovitz Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Katrina Carroll Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Gary F. Lynch Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Pierce, Megan) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14704699.) filed by Tim Janecyk, Steven Vance. (Drury, Scott) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14704650.) filed by Tim Janecyk, Steven Vance. (Kanovitz, Mike) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Katrina Carroll ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14703610.) filed by Tim Janecyk, Steven Vance. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Carroll, Katrina) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Gary F. Lynch ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14703567.) filed by Tim Janecyk, Steven Vance. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lynch, Gary) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd David Carpenter (Carpenter, Todd) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14689550.). Filed bySteven Vance, Tim Janecyk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pierce, Megan) (Filed on 7/14/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vance et al v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Janecyk
Represented By: Megan Colleen Pierce
Represented By: Nicholas Lange
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Scott Robert Drury
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Todd David Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Vance
Represented By: Megan Colleen Pierce
Represented By: Nicholas Lange
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Scott Robert Drury
Represented By: Mike Kanovitz
Represented By: Todd David Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Mara Boundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?