Johnson v. Pedersen et al
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: (A) Tool Shed, Inc. and Bonnie L. Pedersen
Case Number: 5:2020cv04713
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to (A) Tool Shed, Inc., a California Corporation. (Related documents(s) #11 )(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default As to (A) Tool Shed, Inc., a California Corporation only filed by Scott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. (A) Tool Shed, Inc. served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to (A) Tool Shed, Inc., Bonnie L. Pedersen. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/29/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/15/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14692492.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/15/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Pedersen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (A) Tool Shed, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie L. Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Prathima Reddy Price
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?