VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC et al v. Parker
Plaintiff: Vinod Khosla and VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC
Defendant: Jeffrey Parker
Case Number: 5:2020cv04799
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher William Johnstone (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byVinod Khosla, VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Purcell (Purcell, Nicholas) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 08/04/2020. Plaintiffs' opposition is due 8/28. Defendant's reply is due 9/18. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Vinod Khosla, VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chris Johnstone in Support)(Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Vinod Khosla, VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC (and Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vinod Khosla, VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC.. (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher William Johnstone (Johnstone, Christopher) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Jeffrey Parker of Certificate of Service by Email of ECF Nos. 4, 5 & 6 (Platt, Henry) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Jeffrey Parker. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 8/7/2020. Replies due by 8/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Parker in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Platt, Henry) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jeffrey Parker (Platt, Henry) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jeffrey Parker.. (Platt, Henry) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV366303. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14705547). Filed byJeffrey Parker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Platt, Henry) (Filed on 7/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC et al v. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinod Khosla
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Represented By: Christopher William Johnstone
Represented By: Nicholas Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VNK MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Represented By: Christopher William Johnstone
Represented By: Nicholas Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Parker
Represented By: Henry Adam Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?