EIDMANN v. WALGREEN CO.
Plaintiff: CAMERON EIDMANN
Defendant: WALGREEN CO.
Case Number: 5:2020cv04805
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by WALGREEN CO. identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for WALGREEN CO.. (Cotton, Alecia) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Devon Wasserman (Wasserman, Renee) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Angela Wieser (Wieser, Emily) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alecia Elizabeth Cotton (Cotton, Alecia) (Filed on 9/9/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Henry Bates, III (Bates, Joseph) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2020. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CAMERON EIDMANN.. (Wade, Gillian) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to WALGREEN CO.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2030. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/3/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Wade, Gillian) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Statement re #1 Complaint Declaration of Gillian L. Wade Regarding Venue by CAMERON EIDMANN. (Wade, Gillian) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WALGREEN CO. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14706069.). Filed byCAMERON EIDMANN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wade, Gillian) (Filed on 7/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EIDMANN v. WALGREEN CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN CO.
Represented By: Alecia Elizabeth Cotton
Represented By: Emily Angela Wieser
Represented By: Renee Devon Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMERON EIDMANN
Represented By: Gillian Leigh Wade
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Sara Dawn Avila
Represented By: Marc Alexander Castaneda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?