Goldblatt v. Shen et al
Plaintiff: Norman Goldblatt, Keith Uehara and Sigurd Murphy
Defendant: Sky-Watcher USA, Nantong Schmidt Opto-Electrical Technology Co. Ltd., SW Technology Corporation, Synta Technology Corporation of Taiwan, Pacific Telescope Corp., Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Suzhou Synta Optical Technology Co., Ltd., Synta Canada International Enterprises Ltd., Dar Tson "David" Shen, Olivon USA, LLC, Ningbo Sunny Electronic Co., Ltd. and Olivon Manufacturing Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2020cv04860
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Motions to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Hearing held on 9/17/2020 at 9:00 am via Zoom Webinar remotely. The Court GRANTS Amended Motion ECF 38 and Denies Motion ECF 51 . The Court to issue the Order. Plaintiff Attorney: Matthew Borden,Ronald Fisher,Aaron Sheanin,Kellie Lerner,Adam Mendel,Dan Drachler,Lin Chan,Eric Fastiff,Adam Zapala,Elizabeth Castillo. Defendant Attorney: Christopher Frost. Total Time in Court:9:00-10:06am(1Hr.6Mins.) Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/17/2020)
September 14, 2020 Filing 29 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motions to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Hearing set for 9/17/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Edward J. Davila. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar remotely.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ejd Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at EJDcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 9/15/2020 at 2:00 PM PST.***PLEASE NOTE: THE COURT DISCOURAGES THE USE OF A MOBILE PHONE DEVICE AND AIR PODS DUE TO UNSTABLENESS OF CONNECTIVITY AND INAUDIBLE ISSUES FOR THE RECORD***General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/., Set/Reset Deadlines as to (51 in 5:20-cv-03639-EJD) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ROBINS KAPLAN LLP AS INTERIM LEAD OR C O-LEAD COUNSEL FOR INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS; OPPOSITION TO AMENDED MOTION TO APPOINT COTCHETT, PITRE & McCARTHY, LLP, SUSMAN GODFREY LLP, AND LIEFF CABRASE, (38 in 5:20-cv-03639-EJD) Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , (41 in 5:20-cv-03642-EJD) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , (23 in 5:20-cv-04049-EJD) Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , (16 in 5:20-cv-04823-EJD) Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , (19 in 5:20-cv-04860-EJD) Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel . Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 1, 2020 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING MOTION HEARING. Motion as to #19 to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Hearing set for 10/15/2020 is HEREBY ADVANCED to 9/17/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #5 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Robert S. Schachter, Counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/31/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #3 Application for Admission of Attorney for Pro Hac Vice for Dan Drachler, Counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/31/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified text on 8/31/2020 (amkS, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 8/31/2020 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE CONSOLIDATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT (54) in case 5:20-cv-03639-EJD; GRANTING (30) Stipulation in case 5:20-cv-04049-EJD; GRANTING (23) Stipulation in case 5:20-cv-04860-EJD; GRANTING (17) Stipulation in case 5:20-cv-05285-EJD; GRANTING (10) Stipulation in case 5:20-cv-05400-EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/17/2020. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING (29) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 5:20-cv-03639-EJD; GRANTING (31) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 5:20-cv-03642-EJD; GRANTING (15) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 5:20-cv-04049-EJD; GRANTING (8) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 5:20-cv-04823-EJD; GRANTING (8) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 5:20-cv-04860-EJD.6. The docket in Civil Action No. 20-3639 will constitute the master docket, and the file in that action will be the master file for every action that has been consolidated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/17/2020. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) Modified text on 8/17/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CONSOLIDATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT filed by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY (re #19 Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed bySigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara. (Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) filed byCelestron Acquisition, LLC, SW Technology Corporation. (Lin, Ashlee) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 20 Statement of Non-Opposition re #8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byCelestron Acquisition, LLC, SW Technology Corporation. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Lin, Ashlee) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/14/2020. Replies due by 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala, #2 Exhibit A - Zapala Decl., #3 Declaration of Kalpana Srinivasan, #4 Exhibit A - Srinivasan Decl., #5 Exhibit B - Srinivasan Decl., #6 Exhibit C - Srinivasan Decl., #7 Exhibit D - Srinivasan Decl., #8 Exhibit E - Srinivasan Decl., #9 Declaration of Lin Y. Chan, #10 Exhibit A - Chan Decl., #11 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings re Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020) Modified on 7/29/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/29/2020. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/12/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Rose Cole (Cole, Amy Rose) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashlee Nicole Lin (Lin, Ashlee) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Henry (Henry, Amber) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Celestron Acquisition, LLC, SW Technology Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Synta Technology Corporation of Taiwan, Other Affiliate Synta Canada International Enterprises Limited for SW Technology Corporation. (Frost, Christopher) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Lynn Frost (Frost, Christopher) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Nantong Schmidt Opto-Electrical Technology Co. Ltd., Ningbo Sunny Electronic Co., Ltd., Olivon Manufacturing Co. Ltd., Olivon USA, LLC, Pacific Telescope Corp., SW Technology Corporation, Dar Tson "David" Shen, Sky-Watcher USA, Suzhou Synta Optical Technology Co., Ltd., Synta Canada International Enterprises Ltd., Synta Technology Corporation of Taiwan. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sigurd Murphy, Keith Uehara. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/4/2020. Replies due by 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam J. Zapala, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Zapala, Adam) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jalle H. Dafa (Dafa, Jalle) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Norman Goldblatt (Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Administrative Motion with all Supporting Documents Filed in Hightower v. Celestron)(Chan, Lin) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14717562.) filed by Norman Goldblatt. (Attachments: #1 Supplement - Certificate of Good Standing)(Schachter, Robert) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/4/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14716372.) filed by Norman Goldblatt. (Attachments: #1 Supplement - Certificate of Good Standing)(Drachler, Dan) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Chan, Lin) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT -Class Action Complaint against Celestron Acquisition, LLC, Nantong Schmidt Opto-Electrical Technology Co. Ltd., Ningbo Sunny Electronic Co., Ltd., Olivon Manufacturing Co. Ltd., Olivon USA, LLC, Pacific Telescope Corp., SW Technology Corporation, Dar Tson "David" Shen, Sky-Watcher USA, Suzhou Synta Optical Technology Co., Ltd., Synta Canada International Enterprises Ltd., Synta Technology Corporation of Taiwan ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14712394.). Filed byNorman Goldblatt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chan, Lin) (Filed on 7/20/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldblatt v. Shen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky-Watcher USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nantong Schmidt Opto-Electrical Technology Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SW Technology Corporation
Represented By: Amber Henry
Represented By: Ashlee Nicole Lin
Represented By: Christopher Lynn Frost
Represented By: Amy Rose Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synta Technology Corporation of Taiwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Telescope Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celestron Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: Amber Henry
Represented By: Ashlee Nicole Lin
Represented By: Christopher Lynn Frost
Represented By: Amy Rose Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzhou Synta Optical Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synta Canada International Enterprises Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dar Tson "David" Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivon USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ningbo Sunny Electronic Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivon Manufacturing Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Goldblatt
Represented By: Lin Yee Chan
Represented By: Robert S. Schachter
Represented By: Dan Drachler
Represented By: Jalle H. Dafa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Uehara
Represented By: Adam J. Zapala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sigurd Murphy
Represented By: Adam J. Zapala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?